Connecticut 2015 2015 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06852 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/19/2015

                    General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 6852
January Session, 2015  LCO No. 4043
 *_____HB06852PD____030915____*
Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT
Introduced by:
(PD)

General Assembly

Raised Bill No. 6852 

January Session, 2015

LCO No. 4043

*_____HB06852PD____030915____*

Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT 

Introduced by:

(PD)

AN ACT CONCERNING THE MUNICIPAL REIMBURSEMENT AND REVENUE ACCOUNT. 

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. Section 328 of public act 13-247 is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2015)

(a) There is established an account to be known as the "municipal reimbursement and revenue account" which shall be a separate, nonlapsing account within the General Fund. The account shall contain any moneys required by law to be deposited in the account. 

(b) Moneys [in] transferred to the account in accordance with section 87 of public act 13-247 shall be expended by the Office of Policy and Management as follows: (1) For the Nutmeg Network, [one million eighty-seven thousand dollars in each of fiscal years ending June 30, 2014, and June 30, 2015] two million one hundred seventy-four thousand dollars; (2) for a tax incidence study, [five hundred thousand dollars in the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014, and two hundred thousand dollars in the fiscal year ending June 30, 2015] seven hundred thousand dollars; and (3) for the universal chart of accounts, four hundred fifty thousand dollars. [in the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014] Such moneys for the universal chart of accounts may be used to reimburse expenses incurred on or after July 1, 2013. 

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2015 PA 13-247, Sec. 328

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2015

PA 13-247, Sec. 328

 

PD Joint Favorable

PD

Joint Favorable