Connecticut 2016 2016 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05291 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/17/2016

                    General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 5291
February Session, 2016  LCO No. 1085
 *01085_______AGE*
Referred to Committee on AGING
Introduced by:
(AGE)

General Assembly

Raised Bill No. 5291 

February Session, 2016

LCO No. 1085

*01085_______AGE*

Referred to Committee on AGING 

Introduced by:

(AGE)

AN ACT CONCERNING SENIOR CENTERS.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. (Effective July 1, 2016) (a) There is established a task force to study best practices concerning the delivery of health and human services and related information to persons age sixty and older by senior centers, municipal agents, appointed pursuant to section 7-127b of the general statutes, and other municipal employees. The task force shall examine (1) resources and training needs of senior center personnel, municipal agents and other municipal employees to allow them to facilitate delivery of health and human services and related information, (2) the most effective means to provide such resources and training, (3) current information delivery practices, (4) best practices in this state and other states for the delivery of such services and information, (5) barriers to access to information, and (6) data on the cost of resources and staff provided by emergency medical services, municipal police departments and other entities to provide such health and human services and information in the calendar year 2015.

(b) The task force shall consist of the following members:

(1) Two appointed by the speaker of the House of Representatives, one of whom shall be a municipal agent;

(2) Two appointed by the president pro tempore of the Senate, one of whom shall be a senior center director;

(3) One appointed by the majority leader of the House of Representatives, who shall be a director of an area agency on aging;

(4) One appointed by the majority leader of the Senate, who shall be a recipient of services from a senior center;

(5) One appointed by the minority leader of the House of Representatives;

(6) One appointed by the minority leader of the Senate;

(7) The Commissioner on Aging, or the commissioner's designee;

(8) The Commissioner of Social Services, or the commissioner's designee;

(9) The Commissioner of Public Health, or the commissioner's designee;

(10) The executive director of the Commission on Aging, or the executive director's designee; and 

(11) The chairpersons of the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to aging, or such chairpersons' designees.

(c) Any member of the task force appointed under subdivision (1), (2), (5), (6) or (11) of this section may be a member of the General Assembly.

(d) All appointments to the task force shall be made not later than September 1, 2016. Any vacancy shall be filled by the appointing authority.

(e) The speaker of the House of Representatives and the president pro tempore of the Senate shall select the chairpersons of the task force from among the members of the task force. Such chairpersons shall schedule the first meeting of the task force, which shall be held not later than October 1, 2016.

(f) The staff of the Commission on Aging shall serve as administrative staff of the task force.

(g) Not later than July 1, 2017, the task force shall submit a report on its findings and recommendations to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to aging, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes. The task force shall terminate on the date that it submits such report or July 1, 2017, whichever is later.

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2016 New section

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2016

New section

Statement of Purpose: 

To study best practices concerning the delivery of health and human services and related information by senior centers, municipal agents and other municipal stakeholders to senior citizens. 

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]