Connecticut 2016 2016 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05370 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/19/2016

                    General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 5370
February Session, 2016  LCO No. 1503
 *01503_______LAB*
Referred to Committee on LABOR AND PUBLIC EMPLOYEES
Introduced by:
(LAB)

General Assembly

Raised Bill No. 5370 

February Session, 2016

LCO No. 1503

*01503_______LAB*

Referred to Committee on LABOR AND PUBLIC EMPLOYEES 

Introduced by:

(LAB)

AN ACT INCREASING THE MINIMUM FAIR WAGE.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. Subsection (i) of section 31-58 of the 2016 supplement to the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2016):

(i) "Minimum fair wage" in any industry or occupation in this state means a wage of not less than six dollars and seventy cents per hour, and effective January 1, 2003, not less than six dollars and ninety cents per hour, and effective January 1, 2004, not less than seven dollars and ten cents per hour, and effective January 1, 2006, not less than seven dollars and forty cents per hour, and effective January 1, 2007, not less than seven dollars and sixty-five cents per hour, and effective January 1, 2009, not less than eight dollars per hour, and effective January 1, 2010, not less than eight dollars and twenty-five cents per hour, and effective January 1, 2014, not less than eight dollars and seventy cents per hour, and effective January 1, 2015, not less than nine dollars and fifteen cents per hour, and effective January 1, 2016, not less than nine dollars and sixty cents per hour, and effective January 1, 2017, not less than ten dollars and ten cents per hour, and effective January 1, 2018, not less than eleven dollars per hour, and effective January 1, 2019, not less than twelve dollars per hour, and effective January 1, 2020, not less than thirteen dollars per hour, and effective January 1, 2021, not less than fourteen dollars per hour, and effective January 1, 2022, not less than fifteen dollars per hour or one-half of one per cent rounded to the nearest whole cent more than the highest federal minimum wage, whichever is greater, except as may otherwise be established in accordance with the provisions of this part. All wage orders in effect on October 1, 1971, wherein a lower minimum fair wage has been established, are amended to provide for the payment of the minimum fair wage herein established except as hereinafter provided. Whenever the highest federal minimum wage is increased, the minimum fair wage established under this part shall be increased to the amount of said federal minimum wage plus one-half of one per cent more than said federal rate, rounded to the nearest whole cent, effective on the same date as the increase in the highest federal minimum wage, and shall apply to all wage orders and administrative regulations then in force. The rates for learners, beginners, and persons under the age of eighteen years shall be not less than eighty-five per cent of the minimum fair wage for the first two hundred hours of such employment and equal to the minimum fair wage thereafter, except institutional training programs specifically exempted by the commissioner. 

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2016 31-58(i)

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2016

31-58(i)

Statement of Purpose: 

To raise the minimum wage, incrementally, to fifteen dollars per hour. 

 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]