Connecticut 2016 2016 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05604 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/03/2016

                    General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 5604
February Session, 2016  LCO No. 2690
 *02690_______PD_*
Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT
Introduced by:
(PD)

General Assembly

Raised Bill No. 5604 

February Session, 2016

LCO No. 2690

*02690_______PD_*

Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT 

Introduced by:

(PD)

AN ACT CONCERNING REGIONAL EFFICIENCIES.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2016) The Commission on Municipal Opportunities and Regional Efficiencies shall, in consultation with the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management or the secretary's designee, municipalities, labor unions and business leaders, study regionalization best practices in other states and develop a regionalization evaluation tool based on such best practices. Such regionalization evaluation tool shall measure and assess the performance of and efficiencies achieved by each municipality and local and regional board of education.

Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2016) Not later than January 1, 2017, the Commission on Municipal Opportunities and Regional Efficiencies shall submit recommendations for municipal aid funding based on criteria established by the regionalization evaluation tool referenced in section 1 of this act, in accordance with section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to local governments and appropriations.

Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2017) If legislation is enacted based on the criteria of the regionalization evaluation tool developed pursuant to section 1 of this act, the Intergovernmental Policy Division of the Office of Policy and Management shall notify municipalities and local or regional boards of education of such criteria and specify how municipal aid funding will be determined based on such criteria for fiscal year 2019. The Office of Policy and Management shall prescribe a format by which each municipality and local or regional board of education shall report its compliance with the criteria established by such tool. Not later than February 1, 2018, each municipality and local or regional board of education shall submit such report to the Intergovernmental Policy Division of the Office of Policy and Management. The Office of Policy and Management may audit municipalities and local or regional boards of education to ensure compliance.

Sec. 4. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2018) The Intergovernmental Policy Division of the Office of Policy and Management shall implement the regionalization evaluation tool developed pursuant to section 1 of this act and apply the municipal aid funding formula based on each municipality and local or regional board of education's performance relative to the criteria of such tool. 

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2016 New section
Sec. 2 July 1, 2016 New section
Sec. 3 July 1, 2017 New section
Sec. 4 July 1, 2018 New section

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2016

New section

Sec. 2

July 1, 2016

New section

Sec. 3

July 1, 2017

New section

Sec. 4

July 1, 2018

New section

Statement of Purpose: 

To (1) authorize the Commission on Municipal Opportunities and Regional Efficiencies to develop a regionalization evaluation tool to measure and assess the performance of and efficiencies achieved by each municipality and local and regional board of education and submit recommendations for municipal aid funding based on the criteria of such tool, (2) require the Office of Policy and Management to notify municipalities and local and regional boards of education of such criteria if the General Assembly implements such criteria through legislation, and (3) require the Office of Policy and Management to implement the regionalization evaluation tool. 

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]