Connecticut 2016 2016 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05604 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/06/2016

                    General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 5604
February Session, 2016  *_____HB05604PD____032116____*

General Assembly

Substitute Bill No. 5604 

February Session, 2016

*_____HB05604PD____032116____*

AN ACT CONCERNING REGIONAL EFFICIENCIES. 

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2016) The Commission on Municipal Opportunities and Regional Efficiencies shall, in consultation with the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management or the secretary's designee, municipalities, labor unions and business leaders, study regionalization best practices in other states and develop a regionalization evaluation tool based on such best practices. Such regionalization evaluation tool shall measure and assess the performance of and efficiencies achieved by each municipality and local and regional board of education.

Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2016) Not later than July 1, 2017, the Commission on Municipal Opportunities and Regional Efficiencies shall submit recommendations for state funding to municipalities based on criteria established by the regionalization evaluation tool developed pursuant to section 1 of this act, in accordance with section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to local governments and appropriations.

Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2017) If legislation is enacted based on the criteria established by the regionalization evaluation tool developed pursuant to section 1 of this act, the Intergovernmental Policy Division of the Office of Policy and Management shall notify municipalities and local or regional boards of education of such criteria and specify how state funding to municipalities will be determined based on performance relative to such criteria for fiscal year 2019. The Office of Policy and Management shall prescribe a format by which each municipality and local or regional board of education shall report its compliance with the criteria established by said tool. Not later than February 1, 2018, each municipality and local or regional board of education shall submit such report to the Intergovernmental Policy Division of the Office of Policy and Management. The Office of Policy and Management may audit municipalities and local or regional boards of education to ensure compliance.

Sec. 4. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2018) The Intergovernmental Policy Division of the Office of Policy and Management shall implement the regionalization evaluation tool developed pursuant to section 1 of this act and adjust state funding to municipalities and local or regional boards of education based on each municipality and local or regional board of education's performance relative to the criteria established by said tool. For the purposes of this section, the state funding adjustments based on performance relative to the criteria of the regionalization evaluation tool shall not apply to discretionary state funding to municipalities.

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2016 New section
Sec. 2 July 1, 2016 New section
Sec. 3 July 1, 2017 New section
Sec. 4 July 1, 2018 New section

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2016

New section

Sec. 2

July 1, 2016

New section

Sec. 3

July 1, 2017

New section

Sec. 4

July 1, 2018

New section

Statement of Legislative Commissioners: 

In Section 2, "as described in" was changed to "developed pursuant to" for accuracy and consistency; in Section 3, "of" was changed to "established by" for clarity and consistency and "performance relative to" was added before "such criteria for fiscal year 2019." for accuracy and consistency; in Section 4, "of" was changed to "established by" for clarity and consistency; in Section 5, "performance relative to" was added before "the criteria of" for accuracy and consistency; and Section 5 was combined with Section 4 for conciseness.

 

PD Joint Favorable Subst.

PD

Joint Favorable Subst.