General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 5116 January Session, 2017 *_____HB05116HED___032117____* General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 5116 January Session, 2017 *_____HB05116HED___032117____* AN ACT CONCERNING A HIGHER EDUCATION DATA COLLECTION AND TRACKING SYSTEM. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2017) (a) The constituent units of the state system of higher education, as defined in section 10a-1 of the general statutes, and the Labor Department, shall collect data as described in subsections (b) and (d) of this section. Such data shall be made accessible to the public on or before October 1, 2018, by means of an Internet web site, to assist students with making informed decisions concerning higher education and career choices. For the purposes of this section, "degree" means associate degree, bachelor's degree, master's degree and doctorate degree. (b) Not later than January 1, 2018, the constituent units shall provide data to the Labor Department, for the previous ten academic years, relating to sub-baccalaureate certificate and degree completion, including, but not limited to, (1) the number of students that have completed a sub-baccalaureate certificate or degree program currently offered at an institution within the constituent units, (2) the subject matter of the sub-baccalaureate certificate or degree program completed by such students, (3) the degrees earned by such students, (4) the institutions at which such students received sub-baccalaureate certificates or degrees, and (5) the year of completion of such sub-baccalaureate certificate or degree program. (c) Not later than January 1, 2019, and annually thereafter, the constituent units shall collect data, as described in subsection (b) of this section, for the previous academic year, and provide such data to the Labor Department. (d) Not later than July 1, 2018, and annually thereafter, the Labor Department shall collect data relating to the salaries of students who have completed a sub-baccalaureate certificate or degree program at an institution within the constituent units, including, but not limited to, the salaries of such students one year after completion, five years after completion and ten years after completion. The Labor Department shall pair such salary data with the corresponding sub-baccalaureate certificate and degree program completion data. (e) Not later than October 1, 2018, and annually thereafter, the Labor Department shall make such paired data accessible on an Internet web site in aggregate form. (f) The constituent units and the Labor Department may utilize existing data collection networks to implement the provisions of this section. (g) Each public institution of higher education shall post a link to access such data on the institution's Internet web site. This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Section 1 July 1, 2017 New section This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Section 1 July 1, 2017 New section HED Joint Favorable Subst. HED Joint Favorable Subst.