Connecticut 2017 2017 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06608 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/01/2017

                    General Assembly  Committee Bill No. 6608
January Session, 2017  LCO No. 4525
 *04525HB06608HSG*
Referred to Committee on HOUSING
Introduced by:
(HSG)

General Assembly

Committee Bill No. 6608 

January Session, 2017

LCO No. 4525

*04525HB06608HSG*

Referred to Committee on HOUSING 

Introduced by:

(HSG)

AN ACT EXTENDING THE PERIOD OF TIME FOR REQUIRING CERTAIN MUNICIPALITIES TO WAIVE PAYMENT IN LIEU OF TAX PAYMENTS FROM A HOUSING AUTHORITY.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. Section 8-71 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2017):

(a) In lieu of real property taxes, special benefit assessments and sewerage system use charges otherwise payable to such municipality, except in such municipalities as, by special act or charter, on May 20, 1957, had a sewer use charge, an authority shall pay each year to the municipality in which any of its moderate rental housing projects are located a sum to be determined by the municipality, with the approval of the Commissioner of Housing, not in excess of twelve and one-half per cent of the shelter rent per annum for each occupied dwelling unit in any such housing project; except that the amount of such payment shall not be so limited in any case where funds are made available for such payment by an agency or department of the United States government, but no payment shall exceed the amount of taxes which would be paid on the property were the property not exempt from taxation. 

(b) For the period commencing on June 2, 2016, and ending June 30, [2018] 2019, each municipality that received a grant-in-aid pursuant to section 8-216 in the fiscal year ending June 30, 2015, shall waive any payment that becomes payable during such period pursuant to subsection (a) of this section, except that no waiver shall be required in any case where funds are made available for such payment by an agency or department of the United States government. 

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 October 1, 2017 8-71

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

October 1, 2017

8-71

Statement of Purpose: 

To extend the period of time under which a municipality that received certain state funding in the fiscal year ending June 30, 2015, is required to waive PILOT payments from a housing authority. 

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]

 

Co-Sponsors: REP. BUTLER, 72nd Dist.

Co-Sponsors: 

REP. BUTLER, 72nd Dist. 

H.B. 6608