Connecticut 2017 2017 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00342 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 02/22/2017

                    General Assembly  Committee Bill No. 342
January Session, 2017  LCO No. 4150
 *04150SB00342VA_*
Referred to Committee on VETERANS' AFFAIRS
Introduced by:
(VA)

General Assembly

Committee Bill No. 342 

January Session, 2017

LCO No. 4150

*04150SB00342VA_*

Referred to Committee on VETERANS' AFFAIRS 

Introduced by:

(VA)

AN ACT EXPANDING THE DEFINITION OF "VETERAN".

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 27-103 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2017):

(a) As used in the general statutes, except chapter 504, and except as otherwise provided: (1) "Armed forces" means the United States Army, Navy, Marine Corps, Coast Guard and Air Force and any reserve component thereof, including the Connecticut National Guard performing duty as provided in Title 32 of the United States Code, as amended from time to time; (2) "veteran" means any (A) person who was honorably discharged from, or released under honorable conditions from active service in, the armed forces, or (B) member of any reserve component of the armed forces, or of the Connecticut National Guard, during a period of war and who was honorably discharged from, or released under honorable conditions from, such reserve component or the Connecticut National Guard, as the case may be; (3) "service in time of war" means service of ninety or more cumulative days except, if the period of war lasted less than ninety days, "service in time of war" means service for the entire period of war, unless separated from service earlier because of a service-connected disability rated by the Veterans' Administration, during a period of war; and (4) "period of war" has the same meaning as provided in 38 USC 101, as amended, except that the "Vietnam Era" means the period beginning on February 28, 1961, and ending on July 1, 1975, in all cases; and "period of war" shall include service while engaged in combat or a combat support role in Lebanon, July 1, 1958, to November 1, 1958, or September 29, 1982, to March 30, 1984; Grenada, October 25, 1983, to December 15, 1983; Operation Earnest Will, involving the escort of Kuwaiti oil tankers flying the United States flag in the Persian Gulf, July 24, 1987, to August 1, 1990; and Panama, December 20, 1989, to January 31, 1990, and shall include service during such periods with the armed forces of any government associated with the United States. 

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 October 1, 2017 27-103(a)

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

October 1, 2017

27-103(a)

Statement of Purpose: 

To allow armed forces reservists and members of the Connecticut National Guard who served during a period of war to receive state veterans' benefits. 

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]

 

Co-Sponsors: SEN. OSTEN, 19th Dist.; REP. O'NEILL, 69th Dist.

Co-Sponsors: 

SEN. OSTEN, 19th Dist.; REP. O'NEILL, 69th Dist. 

S.B. 342