Connecticut 2017 2017 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00482 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/10/2017

                    General Assembly  Committee Bill No. 482
January Session, 2017  LCO No. 5085
 *05085SB00482GAE*
Referred to Committee on GOVERNMENT ADMINISTRATION AND ELECTIONS
Introduced by:
(GAE)

General Assembly

Committee Bill No. 482 

January Session, 2017

LCO No. 5085

*05085SB00482GAE*

Referred to Committee on GOVERNMENT ADMINISTRATION AND ELECTIONS 

Introduced by:

(GAE)

AN ACT CONCERNING THE PREPARATION OF RACIAL AND ETHNIC IMPACT STATEMENTS.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. Section 2-24b of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2017):

(a) Beginning with the session of the General Assembly commencing on [January 7, 2009] February 7, 2018, a racial and ethnic impact statement shall be prepared at the request of any member of the General Assembly with respect to certain bills and amendments that could, if passed, increase or decrease the pretrial or sentenced population of the correctional facilities in this state. 

(b) [Not later than January 1, 2009, the] The joint standing committee of the General Assembly on judiciary [shall] may make recommendations for a provision to be included in the joint rules of the House of Representatives and the Senate concerning the procedure for the preparation of such racial and ethnic impact statements, the content of such statements and the types of bills and amendments with respect to which such statements should be prepared. 

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 October 1, 2017 2-24b

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

October 1, 2017

2-24b

Statement of Purpose: 

To require racial and ethnic impact statements to be prepared at the request of any legislator. 

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]

 

Co-Sponsors: SEN. WINFIELD, 10th Dist.; REP. GONZALEZ, 3rd Dist.

Co-Sponsors: 

SEN. WINFIELD, 10th Dist.; REP. GONZALEZ, 3rd Dist. 

S.B. 482