Connecticut 2017 2017 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00963 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/01/2017

                    General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 963
January Session, 2017  LCO No. 4740
 *04740_______CE_*
Referred to Committee on COMMERCE
Introduced by:
(CE)

General Assembly

Raised Bill No. 963 

January Session, 2017

LCO No. 4740

*04740_______CE_*

Referred to Committee on COMMERCE 

Introduced by:

(CE)

AN ACT CONCERNING EDUCATIONAL AND ENVIRONMENTAL ISSUES RELATING TO MANUFACTURING.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2017) The State Board of Education, upon receipt of a proper application, shall issue an initial educator certificate, in accordance with the provisions of section 10-145b of the general statutes, to any applicant in the certification endorsement area of occupational subjects in vocational-technical schools who has completed five years of experience in the field for which the certificate is to be endorsed, which may include up to five years of apprenticeship or specialized schooling.

Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective October 1, 2017) (a) Not later than July 1, 2018, the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection shall, in accordance with chapter 54 of the general statutes, issue a notice of intent to adopt regulations fully consistent with the Hazardous Waste Generator Improvements Rule, as published in the Federal Register of November 28, 2016, except for any proposed modifications deemed necessary by the commissioner, in accordance with subsection (h) of section 22a-6 of the general statutes.

(b) If the commissioner is unable to fully comply with the provisions of subsection (a) of this section before July 1, 2018, the Hazardous Waste Generator Improvements Rule described in subsection (a) of this section shall be the standard pertaining to hazardous waste generators in the state until the commissioner adopts regulations as described in said subsection (a). 

Sec. 3. (Effective from passage) (a) Not later than January 1, 2018, the Board of Regents for Higher Education shall develop a plan to (1) expand the number of evening, weekend and online courses offered under programs at Central Connecticut State University granting the degrees or certifications required for faculty of manufacturing program courses in the regional community-technical college system; (2) develop and offer such programs at Charter Oak State College; and (3) offer online courses in the field of mechatronics at Central Connecticut State University and the regional community-technical college system. 

(b) Not later than January 1, 2018, the board shall submit such plan and any recommendations for legislation relating to such plan to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce and higher education, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes.

Sec. 4. (Effective from passage) (a) There is established a task force to develop a program to train inmates in the custody of the Commissioner of Correction for jobs in the manufacturing field.

(b) The task force shall consist of the following members:

(1) Two appointed by the speaker of the House of Representatives, one who is a manufacturing teacher employed by a college or university in this state and one who has experience providing job training to inmates; 

(2) Two appointed by the president pro tempore of the Senate, one who is a manufacturing teacher employed at a technical high school in this state and one who is a representative of a manufacturing association in the state;

(3) One appointed by the majority leader of the House of Representatives, who is an owner or manager of a manufacturing company with fewer than one hundred employees;

(4) One appointed by the majority leader of the Senate, who is an owner or manager of a manufacturing company with one hundred or more employees;

(5) One appointed by the minority leader of the House of Representatives, who is a representative of an association of manufacturers;

(6) One appointed by the minority leader of the Senate, who is a representative from a private education institution with a manufacturing program;

(7) The Commissioner of Economic and Community Development, or the commissioner's designee;

(8) The Labor Commissioner, or the commissioner's designee; and 

(9) The Commissioner of Correction, or the commissioner's designee.

(c) Any member of the task force appointed under subdivision (1), (2), (3), (4), (5) or (6) of subsection (b) of this section may be a member of the General Assembly.

(d) All appointments to the task force shall be made not later than thirty days after the effective date of this section. Any vacancy shall be filled by the appointing authority.

(e) The speaker of the House of Representatives and the president pro tempore of the Senate shall select the chairpersons of the task force from among the members of the task force. Such chairpersons shall schedule the first meeting of the task force, which shall be held not later than sixty days after the effective date of this section.

(f) The administrative staff of the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce shall serve as administrative staff of the task force.

(g) Not later than January 1, 2018, the task force shall submit a report on its findings and recommendations to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce and labor, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes. The task force shall terminate on the date that it submits such report or January 1, 2018, whichever is later.

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2017 New section
Sec. 2 October 1, 2017 New section
Sec. 3 from passage New section
Sec. 4 from passage New section

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2017

New section

Sec. 2

October 1, 2017

New section

Sec. 3

from passage

New section

Sec. 4

from passage

New section

Statement of Purpose: 

To (1) decrease the number of years of employment experience an applicant seeking teacher certification for a position at a technical high school shall complete from eight years to five years, (2) require the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection to adopt regulations consistent with the federal Hazardous Waste Generator Improvements Rule, (3) require the Board of Regents for Higher Education to develop a plan to offer certain manufacturing related courses across the state, and (4) establish a task force to develop a program to train inmates for jobs in the manufacturing field. 

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]