General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 963 January Session, 2017 *_____SB00963CE____032117____* General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 963 January Session, 2017 *_____SB00963CE____032117____* AN ACT CONCERNING EDUCATIONAL AND ENVIRONMENTAL ISSUES RELATING TO MANUFACTURING. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2017) The State Board of Education, upon receipt of a proper application, shall issue an initial educator certificate, in accordance with the provisions of section 10-145b of the general statutes, to any applicant in the certification endorsement area of occupational subjects in vocational-technical schools who completes five years of experience in the field for which such certificate is to be endorsed, including, but not limited to, five years of apprenticeship or specialized schooling. Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective October 1, 2017) (a) Not later than July 1, 2018, the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection shall, in accordance with chapter 54 of the general statutes, issue a notice of intent to adopt regulations fully consistent with the Hazardous Waste Generator Improvements Rule, as published in the Federal Register of November 28, 2016, except for any proposed modifications deemed necessary by the commissioner, in accordance with subsection (h) of section 22a-6 of the general statutes. (b) If the commissioner is unable to fully comply with the provisions of subsection (a) of this section before July 1, 2018, the Hazardous Waste Generator Improvements Rule described in subsection (a) of this section shall be the standard pertaining to hazardous waste generators in the state until the commissioner adopts regulations as described in said subsection (a). Sec. 3. (Effective from passage) (a) Not later than January 1, 2018, the Board of Regents for Higher Education shall develop a plan to (1) expand the number of evening, weekend and online courses offered under programs at Central Connecticut State University granting the degrees or certifications required for faculty of manufacturing program courses in the regional community-technical college system; (2) develop and offer such programs at Charter Oak State College; and (3) offer online courses in the field of mechatronics at Central Connecticut State University and the regional community-technical college system. (b) Not later than January 1, 2018, the board shall submit such plan and any recommendations for legislation relating to such plan to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce and higher education, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes. Sec. 4. (Effective from passage) (a) The chairpersons of the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce shall appoint and convene a working group to develop a program to train inmates in the custody of the Commissioner of Correction for jobs in the manufacturing field. (b) Appointments to the working group shall include, but need not be limited to, a manufacturing instructor employed by a college or university, a person who has experience providing job training to inmates, a manufacturing teacher employed at a technical high school, a representative of an association of manufacturers, an owner or manager of a manufacturing company with fewer than one hundred employees, an owner or manager of a manufacturing company with more than one hundred employees, a representative of a private educational institution with a manufacturing program, the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development, or the commissioner's designee, the Labor Commissioner, or the commissioner's designee, and the Commissioner of Correction, or the commissioner's designee. All appointments to the working group shall be made not later than thirty days after the effective date of this section. (c) The chairpersons of the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce shall select the chairperson of the working group. The chairperson of the working group shall schedule the first meeting of the working group, which shall be held not later than sixty days after the effective date of this section. (d) Not later than January 15, 2018, the working group shall submit legislative recommendations to implement the program developed pursuant to subsection (a) of this section to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce, labor and the judiciary, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes. The working group shall terminate on the date that it submits such report or January 15, 2018, whichever is later. This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Section 1 July 1, 2017 New section Sec. 2 October 1, 2017 New section Sec. 3 from passage New section Sec. 4 from passage New section This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Section 1 July 1, 2017 New section Sec. 2 October 1, 2017 New section Sec. 3 from passage New section Sec. 4 from passage New section CE Joint Favorable Subst. CE Joint Favorable Subst.