Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05682 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/05/2019

                     
 
 
LCO No. 5015   	1 of 2 
 
General Assembly  Committee Bill No. 5682  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 5015 
 
 
Referred to Committee on COMMITTEE ON CHILDREN  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(KID)  
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR POST-
SECONDARY EDUCATION EXPENSES FOR CERTAIN INDIVIDUALS 
ADOPTED THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF CHILDR EN AND 
FAMILIES FOSTER CARE PROGRAM. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (Effective July 1, 2019) Not later than October 1, 2019, the 1 
Commissioner of Children and Families shall amend Department of 2 
Children and Families policy 25-2, effective January 2, 2019, 3 
concerning financial assistance for post-secondary education expenses 4 
by expanding the eligibility criteria to receive such assistance to 5 
include any individual adopted through the department's foster care 6 
program on or after January 1, 2001, provided such individual meets 7 
all other eligibility requirements of such policy. 8 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2019 New section 
    
Committee Bill No.  5682 
 
 
LCO No. 5015   	2 of 2 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To require the Commissioner of Children and Families to amend the 
policy of the Department of Children and Families concerning 
financial assistance for post-secondary education expenses by 
expanding the provision of such assistance to any individual adopted 
through the department on or after January 1, 2001. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, 
except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is 
not underlined.] 
 
Co-Sponsors:  REP. PETIT, 22nd Dist.; REP. WINKLER, 56th Dist. 
REP. YACCARINO, 87th Dist.; SEN. FASANO, 34th Dist.  
 
H.B. 5682