Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05682 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/28/2019

                     
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-05682-R02-
HB.docx  
1 of 2 
 
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 5682  
January Session, 2019 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING FI NANCIAL ASSISTANCE F OR POST-
SECONDARY EDUCATION EXPENSES FOR CERTAIN INDIVIDUALS 
ADOPTED THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF CHILDR EN AND 
FAMILIES FOSTER CARE PROGRAM.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (Effective July 1, 2019) Not later than October 1, 2019, the 1 
Commissioner of Children and Families shall amend the Department 2 
of Children and Families policy 25-2, effective January 2, 2019, 3 
concerning financial assistance for post-secondary education expenses, 4 
by expanding the eligibility criteria to receive such assistance to 5 
include any individual adopted through the department's foster care 6 
program during the period beginning January 1, 2001, and ending 7 
December 31, 2004, provided (1) such individual meets all other 8 
eligibility requirements of such policy, and (2) any such assistance to 9 
such individual shall not exceed such individual's demonstrated 10 
financial need, as determined by the Federal Student Aid Office of the 11 
United States Department of Education. 12 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2019 New section 
 
Statement of Legislative Commissioners:   
Subdivision (2) was reworded for clarity.  Substitute Bill No. 5682 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-05682-
R02-HB.docx }   
2 of 2 
 
 
KID Joint Favorable Subst.