Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05910 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/25/2019

                     
 
 
LCO No. 6470   	1 of 3 
  
General Assembly  Committee Bill No. 5910  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 6470 
 
 
Referred to Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(PH)  
 
 
 
AN ACT LIMITING THE USE OF PERFLUOROALKYL AND 
POLYFLUOROALKYL SUBS TANCES IN CERTAIN PRODUCTS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2019) (a) As used in this section 1 
and section 2 of this act:  2 
(1) "Perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances" mean a class of 3 
fluorinated organic chemicals containing at least one fully fluorinated 4 
carbon atom; 5 
(2) "Food packaging" means a material that is intended for direct 6 
food contact and for single or limited use, including, but not limited to, 7 
take-out containers and deli or bakery trays and wrappers; and 8 
(3) "Reasonable alternative" means a product that has a similar use 9 
and cost as the original product, but does not contain intentionally 10 
added polyfluoroalkyl chemicals in any amount. 11 
(b) The Department of Public Health shall examine the availability 12 
of reasonable alternatives to any food packaging product that contains 13 
an intentionally added perfluoroalkyl or polyfluoroalkyl substance. 14    
Committee Bill No.  5910 
 
 
LCO No. 6470   	2 of 3 
 
Not later than January 1, 2020, the department shall report, in 15 
accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, 16 
to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having 17 
cognizance of matters relating to public health on the results of such 18 
examination and a list of food packaging products that contain an 19 
intentionally added perfluoroalkyl or polyfluoroalkyl substance for 20 
which a reasonable alternative is available. 21 
(c) On and after January 1, 2021, no person may manufacture, 22 
knowingly sell, offer for sale, distribute for sale or distribute for use in 23 
the state food packaging that contains a perfluoroalkyl or 24 
polyfluoroalkyl substance that was intentionally added to such 25 
packaging in any amount when the department has determined, 26 
pursuant to subsection (b) of this section, that a reasonable alternative 27 
to such food packaging is available. 28 
(d) The provisions of this section may be enforced, within available 29 
appropriations, by the Commissioner of Consumer Protection. 30 
Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2019) (a) As used in this section, "class 31 
B firefighting foam" means a foam for the purpose of extinguishing 32 
flammable liquid fires. 33 
(b) The Department of Public Health shall examine the availability 34 
of reasonable alternatives to any class B firefighting foam that contains 35 
an intentionally added perfluoroalkyl or polyfluoroalkyl substance. 36 
Not later than January 1, 2020, the department shall report, in 37 
accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, 38 
to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having 39 
cognizance of matters relating to public health on the results of such 40 
examination. 41 
(c) On and after July 1, 2020, (1) no person, local government or state 42 
agency may discharge or otherwise use for training purposes a class B 43 
firefighting foam that contains an intentionally added perfluoroalkyl 44 
or polyfluoroalkyl substance in any amount, and (2) a manufacturer of 45    
Committee Bill No.  5910 
 
 
LCO No. 6470   	3 of 3 
 
a class B firefighting foam may not manufacture, knowingly sell, offer 46 
for sale, distribute for sale or distribute for use in the state a class B 47 
firefighting foam that contains an intentionally added perfluoroalkyl 48 
or polyfluoroalkyl substance in any amount, unless the addition of a 49 
perfluoroalkyl or polyfluoroalkyl substance is necessary for the 50 
purpose of complying with federal law, including, but not limited to, 51 
the requirements set forth in 14 CFR 139.317, as amended from time to 52 
time. 53 
(d) The provisions of this section may be enforced, within available 54 
appropriations, by the Commissioner of Consumer Protection. 55 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2019 New section 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2019 New section 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To limit the use of perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances in 
food packaging and firefighting foam. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, 
except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is 
not underlined.] 
 
Co-Sponsors:  REP. STEINBERG, 136th Dist.; REP. GRESKO, 121st Dist. 
REP. ARNONE, 58th Dist.; SEN. BERGSTEIN, 36th Dist. 
REP. GILCHREST, 18th Dist.; REP. REYES, 75th Dist. 
REP. LEMAR, 96th Dist.  
 
H.B. 5910