Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB07055 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/15/2019

                     
 
 
LCO No. 6049   	1 of 5 
 
General Assembly  Committee Bill No. 7055  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 6049 
 
 
Referred to Committee on PUBLIC SAFETY AND SECURITY  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(PS)  
 
 
 
AN ACT CREATING A COMPETITIVE BIDDING PROCESS FOR A 
RESORT-CASINO FACILITY. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (Effective July 1, 2019) (a) Not later than November 1, 2019, 1 
the Commissioner of Consumer Protection shall develop and issue a 2 
request for proposals to qualify an individual, a business organization 3 
or an Indian tribe to develop, manage, operate and maintain a resort-4 
casino facility in the state.  5 
(b) The request for proposals shall require a responder to: 6 
(1) Provide an outline of the significant benefits that the proposed 7 
resort-casino facility will bring to the municipality in which the 8 
proposed resort-casino facility may be located, the surrounding 9 
municipalities and the state, and include a marketing and tourism 10 
plan; 11 
(2) Submit (A) a development agreement entered into by the 12 
responder with a municipality regarding the establishment of the 13 
proposed resort-casino facility in the municipality, that (i) requires the 14    
Committee Bill No.  7055 
 
 
LCO No. 6049   	2 of 5 
 
responder to make an annual payment to the municipality in an 15 
amount not less than eight million dollars if and when the proposed 16 
resort-casino facility becomes operational, and (ii) was approved, 17 
notwithstanding the provisions of any municipal charter, special act or 18 
ordinance, by a referendum of the municipality not later than January 19 
1, 2020, and (B) a plan for revenue sharing with municipalities 20 
surrounding the municipality in which the proposed resort-casino 21 
facility may be located; 22 
(3) Submit a workforce development agreement entered into by the 23 
responder with a municipality regarding the establishment of a 24 
regional workforce development center to be located in the 25 
municipality for the purposes of training employees of the proposed 26 
resort-casino facility; 27 
(4) Submit a market analysis detailing the benefits of the proposed 28 
resort-casino facility; 29 
(5) Agree to make a total investment of not less than five hundred 30 
million dollars in the proposed resort-casino facility; 31 
(6) Provide information and documentation to demonstrate that the 32 
responder has sufficient business ability, experience and financial 33 
stability to develop, manage, operate and maintain the proposed 34 
resort-casino facility; 35 
(7) Submit the designs for the proposed resort-casino facility and a 36 
timeline for its construction; 37 
(8) Estimate the number of employees, which shall be not less than 38 
two thousand individuals, to be employed at the proposed resort-39 
casino facility and provide information regarding the pay rates and 40 
benefits for such employees; 41 
(9) Provide evidence that the responder has a labor neutrality 42 
agreement with organized labor for the proposed resort-casino facility;  43    
Committee Bill No.  7055 
 
 
LCO No. 6049   	3 of 5 
 
(10) Describe the responder's plans to maximize the use of small 44 
contractors and minority business enterprises, as both terms are 45 
defined in section 4a-60g of the general statutes, and veteran-owned 46 
micro businesses, as defined in subsection (c) of section 4a-59 of the 47 
general statutes;  48 
(11) Submit a responsible gaming plan associated with the operation 49 
of the proposed resort-casino facility; 50 
(12) Describe the types and number of games to be conducted at the 51 
proposed resort-casino facility; 52 
(13) Demonstrate the responder's ability to pay a one-time licensing 53 
fee of not less than fifty million dollars for a possible license to operate 54 
the proposed resort-casino facility in the state before the 55 
commencement of construction of the proposed resort-casino facility;  56 
(14) Agree to pay to the state (A) a minimum of twenty-five per cent 57 
of the gross gaming revenue from the operation of all gambling games 58 
at the proposed resort-casino facility, and (B) a minimum of ten per 59 
cent of the gross gaming revenue from the operation of video slot 60 
machine games at the proposed resort-casino facility; and 61 
(15) Provide any other information the commissioner deems 62 
necessary to evaluate the qualifications of the responder. 63 
(c) Each proposal shall be submitted by January 1, 2020, and shall be 64 
accompanied by a fee of five million dollars, which shall be refundable 65 
if (1) the responder is not selected by the commissioner to be qualified 66 
and waives the right to challenge the commission's decision, or (2) the 67 
General Assembly does not enact legislation to authorize the operation 68 
of a resort-casino facility in the state.  69 
(d) The commissioner shall develop selection criteria to evaluate 70 
responses and may qualify one person, business organization or Indian 71 
tribe that submits a response to the request for proposals to develop, 72 
manage, operate and maintain a resort-casino facility in the state.  73    
Committee Bill No.  7055 
 
 
LCO No. 6049   	4 of 5 
 
(e) Not later than April 1, 2020, the commissioner shall submit a 74 
report, in accordance with section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the 75 
joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance 76 
of matters relating to public safety and security and commerce that (1) 77 
describes and summarizes the request for proposals, the responses 78 
received and the selection criteria, (2) identifies the individual, 79 
business organization or Indian tribe selected by the commissioner to 80 
be qualified to develop, manage, operate and maintain a proposed 81 
resort-casino facility in the state, and (3) demonstrates that such 82 
person, business organization or Indian tribe satisfies the requirements 83 
of the request for proposal set forth in subsection (b) of this section and 84 
meets the selection criteria.  85 
(f) No individual, business organization or Indian tribe selected by 86 
the commissioner may operate a resort-casino facility in the state until 87 
the General Assembly has enacted legislation to provide for the 88 
licensing and operation of a resort-casino facility and such legislation 89 
has taken effect. 90 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2019 New section 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To create a competitive bidding process for a resort-casino facility. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, 
except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is 
not underlined.] 
 
Co-Sponsors:  REP. SANTIAGO E., 130th Dist.; REP. ROSARIO, 128th Dist. 
REP. STAFSTROM, 129th Dist.; REP. DIMASSA, 116th Dist. 
REP. PAOLILLO, 97th Dist.; REP. HENNESSY, 127th Dist. 
REP. WALKER, 93rd Dist.; REP. LEMAR, 96th Dist. 
SEN. BRADLEY, 23rd Dist.; REP. BAKER, 124th Dist. 
REP. PORTER, 94th Dist.; SEN. LOGAN, 17th Dist. 
REP. GRESKO, 121st Dist.; REP. CANDELARIA, 95th Dist. 
REP. PERILLO, 113th Dist.; REP. FISHBEIN, 90th Dist.    
Committee Bill No.  7055 
 
 
LCO No. 6049   	5 of 5 
 
REP. MCGORTY, 122nd Dist.  
 
H.B. 7055