LCO No. 4078 1 of 5 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 7119 January Session, 2019 LCO No. 4078 Referred to Committee on HIGHER EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT ADVANCEMENT Introduced by: (HED) AN ACT CONCERNING ST UDENT TRUSTEES AND THE ELE CTION OF ALUMNI TO THE BOA RD OF TRUSTEES OF TH E UNIVERSITY OF CONNECTICUT. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: Section 1. Section 10a-103 of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2019): 2 (a) There shall continue to be a Board of Trustees for The University 3 of Connecticut to consist of [twenty-one] twenty-three persons, 4 [twelve] thirteen to be appointed by the Governor, who shall reflect the 5 state's geographic, racial and ethnic diversity; two to be elected by the 6 university alumni; [two] three to be elected by the students enrolled at 7 the institutions under the jurisdiction of said board; and five members 8 ex officio. 9 (b) On or before July 1, 1983, the Governor shall appoint [members] 10 trustees to the board as follows: Four [members] trustees for a term of 11 two years from said date; four [members] trustees for a term of four 12 years from said date; and four [members] trustees for a term of six 13 Raised Bill No. 7119 LCO No. 4078 2 of 5 years from said date. Thereafter, the Governor shall appoint trustees of 14 said university to succeed those appointees whose terms expire, and 15 each trustee so appointed shall hold office for a period of six years 16 from the first day of July in the year of his or her appointment, 17 provided two of the trustees appointed for terms commencing July 1, 18 1995, and their successors shall be alumni of the university, one of the 19 trustees appointed for a term commencing July 1, 1997, and his or her 20 successors shall be such alumni and one of the members appointed for 21 a term commencing July 1, 1999, and his or her successors shall be such 22 alumni. On or before July 1, 2020, the Governor shall appoint one 23 additional trustee to serve a term of one year commencing on July 1, 24 2020, provided such trustee shall be enrolled as a full-time student in 25 the School of Law, the School of Medicine, the School of Dentistry, the 26 School of Social Work or as a graduate student of a school or college of 27 the university at the time of his or her appointment and for the 28 duration of his or her term. Thereafter, the Governor shall appoint a 29 trustee to succeed a student appointee whose term expires and each 30 trustee so appointed shall serve for a term of two years commencing 31 on July first of the year of his or her appointment, provided such 32 trustee shall be enrolled as a full-time student in the School of Law, the 33 School of Medicine, the School of Dentistry, the School of Social Work 34 or as a graduate student of a school or college of the university at the 35 time of his or her appointment and for the duration of his or her term. 36 (c) The Commissioner of Agriculture, the Commissioner of 37 Education, the Commissioner of Economic and Community 38 Development and the chairperson of The University of Connecticut 39 Health Center Board of Directors shall be, ex officio, members of the 40 board of trustees. The Governor shall be, ex officio, president of said 41 board. 42 (d) The graduates of all of the schools and colleges of said university 43 shall, prior to September first in the odd-numbered years, elect one 44 trustee, who shall be a graduate of the institution and who shall hold 45 office for four years from the first day of September succeeding his or 46 her election. Not less than two or more than four nominations for each 47 Raised Bill No. 7119 LCO No. 4078 3 of 5 such election shall be made by the alumni association of said 48 university, provided no person who has served as an alumni trustee 49 for the two full consecutive terms immediately prior to the term for 50 which such election is to be held shall be nominated for any such 51 election. Such election shall be conducted [by mail] prior to September 52 first under the supervision of a canvassing board consisting of three 53 members, one appointed by the board of trustees, one by the board of 54 directors of the alumni association of the university and one by the 55 president of the university. No ballot in such election, whether in 56 paper or electronic form, shall be opened until the date by which 57 ballots must be returned to the canvassing board. In such election, all 58 graduates shall be entitled to vote by signed paper or electronic ballots. 59 [which have been circulated to them by mail and which shall be 60 returned by mail.] Vacancies occurring by death or resignation of 61 either of such alumni trustees shall be filled for the unexpired portion 62 of the term by special election, if such unexpired term is for more than 63 eighteen months. When the unexpired term is eighteen months or less, 64 such vacancy shall be filled by appointment by the board of directors 65 of said alumni association. 66 (e) On or before November 1, 1975, the students of The University of 67 Connecticut shall, in such manner as the board of trustees of said 68 university shall determine, elect two trustees, each of whom shall be 69 enrolled as a full-time student of said university at the time of his or 70 her election. One such [member] trustee shall be elected for a term of 71 one year from November 1, 1975, and one for a term of two years from 72 said date. Prior to July first, annually until June 30, 2021, such students 73 shall, in accordance with this section and in such manner as the board 74 shall determine, elect one [member] trustee of said board, who shall be 75 so enrolled at said university at the time of his or her election and who 76 shall serve for a term of two years from July first in the year of his or 77 her election. On or before July 1, 2020, such students shall, in 78 accordance with this subsection and in such manner as the board shall 79 determine, elect one additional trustee who shall be enrolled as a full-80 time student at said university at the time of his or her election and 81 Raised Bill No. 7119 LCO No. 4078 4 of 5 who shall serve a term of one year commencing July 1, 2020. 82 Thereafter, in accordance with this subsection and in such manner as 83 the board shall determine, on or before July first such students shall 84 elect two trustees of said board in odd-numbered years and one trustee 85 in even-numbered years who shall be enrolled as full-time students at 86 said university at the time of their election and who shall serve for a 87 term of two years from July first in the year of their election. The 88 student [member] trustee elected to fill the term [expiring] 89 commencing on [June 30, 2003] July 1, 2001 and July 1, 2020, and such 90 elected [member's] trustees' successors, shall be enrolled as a full-time 91 undergraduate student at a school or college of the university and shall 92 be elected by the undergraduate students of the schools and colleges of 93 the university. The student [member] trustee elected to fill the term 94 [expiring] commencing on [June 30, 2004] July 1, 2002, and such elected 95 [member's] trustee's successors, shall be enrolled as a full-time student 96 in the School of Law, the School of Medicine, the School of Dentistry, 97 the School of Social Work, or as a graduate student of a school or 98 college of the university, and shall be elected by the students of the 99 School of Law, the School of Medicine, the School of Dentistry, the 100 School of Social Work and the graduate students of the schools and 101 colleges of the university. Any student [member] trustee elected after 102 July 1, 2013, shall be enrolled as a full-time student at the time of his or 103 her election and for the duration of his or her term of service. Any 104 vacancies in the elected membership of said board shall, except as 105 otherwise provided in subsection (d) of this section, be filled by special 106 election for the balance of the unexpired term. Any increase to the 107 student membership on said board of trustees shall not impact the 108 membership of students on any other boards related to or established 109 by said university. 110 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Section 1 October 1, 2019 10a-103 Raised Bill No. 7119 LCO No. 4078 5 of 5 Statement of Purpose: To add one additional undergraduate student and one additional graduate student to the Board of Trustees of The University of Connecticut. [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]