LCO No. 3974 1 of 5 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 7206 January Session, 2019 LCO No. 3974 Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT Introduced by: (PD) AN ACT ESTABLISHING A PROPERTY TAX EXEMPTION FOR CERTAIN RENEWABLE EN ERGY SOURCES AND HYD ROPOWER FACILITIES. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: Section 1. Subdivision (57) of section 12-81 of the general statutes is 1 repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective 2 October 1, 2019, and applicable to assessment years commencing on or after 3 October 1, 2019): 4 (57) (A) (i) Any Class I renewable energy source, as defined in 5 section 16-1, or hydropower facility described in subdivision (21) of 6 subsection (a) of section 16-1, installed for the generation of electricity 7 where such electricity is intended for private residential use or on a 8 farm, as defined in subsection (q) of section 1-1, provided (I) such 9 installation occurs on or after October 1, 2007, [and further provided] 10 (II) the estimated annual production of such source or facility does not 11 exceed the estimated annual load for the location where such source or 12 facility is located, where such load and production are estimated as of 13 the date of installation of the source or facility as indicated in the 14 Raised Bill No. 7206 LCO No. 3974 2 of 5 written application filed pursuant to subparagraph (E) of this 15 subdivision, and (III) such installation is for a single family dwelling, a 16 multifamily dwelling consisting of two to four units or a farm; [,] (ii) 17 any passive or active solar water or space heating system; [,] or (iii) any 18 geothermal energy resource. In the case of subparagraph (A)(i) of this 19 subdivision, the utilization of or participation in any net metering or 20 tariff policy or program implemented by the state or ownership of 21 such source or facility by a party other than the owner of the real 22 property upon which such source or facility is installed shall not 23 disqualify such source or facility from exemption pursuant to this 24 section. In the case of clause (ii) or (iii) of this subparagraph, such 25 exemption shall apply only to the amount by which the assessed 26 valuation of the real property equipped with such system or resource 27 exceeds the assessed valuation of such real property equipped with the 28 conventional portion of the system or resource; 29 (B) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2013, 30 any Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 16-1, 31 hydropower facility described in subdivision (21) of subsection (a) of 32 section 16-1, or solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy source, 33 installed for generation or displacement of energy, provided (i) such 34 installation occurs on or after January 1, 2010, (ii) such installation is 35 for commercial or industrial purposes, (iii) the nameplate capacity of 36 such source or facility does not exceed the load for the location where 37 such generation or displacement is located, and (iv) such source or 38 facility is located in a distressed municipality, as defined in section 32-39 9p, with a population between one hundred twenty-five thousand and 40 one hundred thirty-five thousand; 41 (C) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2013, 42 any municipality may, upon approval by its legislative body or in any 43 town in which the legislative body is a town meeting, by the board of 44 selectmen, abate up to one hundred per cent of property tax for any 45 Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 16-1, 46 hydropower facility described in subdivision (21) of subsection (a) of 47 section 16-1, or solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy source, 48 Raised Bill No. 7206 LCO No. 3974 3 of 5 installed for generation or displacement of energy, provided (i) such 49 installation occurs between January 1, 2010, and December 31, 2013, (ii) 50 such installation is for commercial or industrial purposes, (iii) the 51 nameplate capacity of such source or facility does not exceed the load 52 for the location where such generation or displacement is located, and 53 (iv) such source or facility is not located in a municipality described in 54 subparagraph (B) of this subdivision; 55 (D) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2014, 56 any (i) Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 16-1, (ii) 57 hydropower facility described in subdivision (21) of subsection (a) of 58 section 16-1, or (iii) solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy 59 source, installed for generation or displacement of energy, provided (I) 60 such installation occurs on or after January 1, 2014, (II) is for 61 commercial or industrial purposes, (III) the [nameplate capacity] 62 estimated annual production of such source or facility does not exceed 63 the estimated annual load for the location where such generation or 64 displacement is located or the aggregated load of the beneficial 65 accounts for any Class I renewable energy source participating in 66 virtual net metering pursuant to section 16-244u, where such load and 67 production are estimated as of the date of installation of the source or 68 facility as indicated in the written application filed pursuant to 69 subparagraph (E) of this subdivision, and (IV) in the case of clause (iii) 70 of this subparagraph, such exemption shall apply only to the amount 71 by which the assessed valuation of the real property equipped with 72 such source exceeds the assessed valuation of such real property 73 equipped with the conventional portion of the source; 74 (E) Any person claiming the exemption provided in this subdivision 75 for any assessment year shall, on or before the first day of November 76 in such assessment year, file with the assessor or board of assessors in 77 the town in which such hydropower facility, Class I renewable energy 78 source, solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy source or 79 passive or active solar water or space heating system or geothermal 80 energy resource is located, a written application claiming such 81 exemption. Such application shall be made on a form prepared for 82 Raised Bill No. 7206 LCO No. 3974 4 of 5 such purpose by the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management, 83 and shall include, but not be limited to, a statement of the estimated 84 annual load and production of a source or facility described in 85 subparagraphs (A)(i) and (D) of this subdivision as of the date of the 86 installation of such source or facility. Said secretary shall make such 87 application available to the public on the Internet web site of the Office 88 of Policy and Management. Failure to file such application in the 89 manner and form as provided [by such assessor or board within the 90 time limit prescribed] shall constitute a waiver of the right to such 91 exemption for such assessment year. Such application shall not be 92 required for any assessment year following that for which the initial 93 application is filed, provided if such hydropower facility, Class I 94 renewable energy source, solar thermal or geothermal renewable 95 energy source or passive or active solar water or space heating system 96 or geothermal energy resource is altered in a manner which would 97 require a building permit, such alteration shall be deemed a waiver of 98 the right to such exemption until a new application, applicable with 99 respect to such altered source, is filed and the right to such exemption 100 is established as required initially. In the event that a person owns 101 more than one such source or facility in a municipality, such person 102 may file a single application identifying each such source or facility; 103 (F) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2015, 104 any municipality may, by vote of its legislative body or, in a 105 municipality where the legislative body is a town meeting, by vote of 106 the board of selectmen, abate up to one hundred per cent of the 107 property taxes due for any tax year, for not longer than the term of the 108 power purchase agreement, with respect to any Class I renewable 109 energy source, as defined in section 16-1, that is the subject of such 110 power purchase agreement approved by the Public Utilities 111 Regulatory Authority pursuant to section 16a-3f; 112 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Raised Bill No. 7206 LCO No. 3974 5 of 5 Section 1 October 1, 2019, and applicable to assessment years commencing on or after October 1, 2019 12-81(57) Statement of Purpose: To establish a property tax exemption for certain renewable energy sources and hydropower facilities. [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]