Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB07291 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/28/2019

                        
 
LCO No. 5088  	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 7291  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 5088 
 
 
Referred to Committee on PUBLIC SAFETY AND SECURITY  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(PS)  
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING SC HOOL SECURITY. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 10-222n of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage): 2 
(a) Not later than January 1, 2014, the Department of Emergency 3 
Services and Public Protection, in consultation with the Department of 4 
Education, shall develop school security and safety plan standards. 5 
Not later than January 1, 2020, and every three years thereafter, the 6 
Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, in 7 
consultation with the Department of Education, shall reevaluate and 8 
update the school security and safety plan standards. The school 9 
security and safety plan standards shall be an all-hazards approach to 10 
emergencies at public schools and shall include, but not be limited to, 11 
(1) involvement of local officials, including the chief executive officer 12 
of the municipality, the superintendent of schools, law enforcement, 13 
fire, public health, emergency management and emergency medical 14 
services, in the development of school security and safety plans, (2) a 15 
command center organization structure based on the federal National 16 
Incident Management System and a description of the responsibilities 17  Raised Bill No.  7291 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5088   	2 of 4 
 
of such command center organization, (3) a requirement that a school 18 
security and safety committee be established at each school, in 19 
accordance with the provisions of section 10-222m, (4) crisis 20 
management procedures, (5) a requirement that local law enforcement 21 
and other local public safety officials evaluate, score and provide 22 
feedback on fire drills and crisis response drills, conducted pursuant to 23 
section 10-231, (6) a requirement that local and regional boards of 24 
education annually submit reports to the Department of Emergency 25 
Services and Public Protection regarding such fire drills and crisis 26 
response drills, (7) procedures for managing various types of 27 
emergencies, (8) a requirement that each local and regional board of 28 
education conduct a security and vulnerability assessment for each 29 
school under the jurisdiction of such board every two years and 30 
develop a school security and safety plan for each such school, in 31 
accordance with the provisions of section 10-222m, based on the results 32 
of such assessment, (9) a requirement that the safe school climate 33 
committee for each school, established pursuant to section 10-222k, 34 
collect and evaluate information relating to instances of disturbing or 35 
threatening behavior that may not meet the definition of bullying, as 36 
defined in section 10-222d, and report such information, as necessary, 37 
to the district safe school climate coordinator, described in section 10-38 
222k, and the school security and safety committee for the school, 39 
established pursuant to section 10-222m, and (10) a requirement that 40 
the school security and safety plan for each school provide an 41 
orientation on such school security and safety plan to each school 42 
employee, as defined in section 10-222d, at such school and provide 43 
violence prevention training in a manner prescribed in such school 44 
security and safety plan. The Department of Emergency Services and 45 
Public Protection shall make such standards available to local officials, 46 
including local and regional boards of education, and the Department 47 
of Education shall distribute such standards to all public schools 48 
within the state. 49 
(b) Not later than January 1, 2014, and annually thereafter, the 50 
Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection shall submit 51  Raised Bill No.  7291 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5088   	3 of 4 
 
the school security and safety plan standards and any 52 
recommendations for legislation regarding such standards to the joint 53 
standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of 54 
matters relating to public safety and education, in accordance with the 55 
provisions of section 11-4a.  56 
Sec. 2. (Effective from passage) (a) The Department of Emergency 57 
Services and Public Protection shall evaluate and seek methods to 58 
simplify the documentation required from local and regional boards of 59 
education to comply with the reporting requirements of section 10-60 
244m of the general statutes and subdivision (6) of subsection (a) of 61 
section 10-222n of the general statutes, as amended by this act. Not 62 
later than January 1, 2020, the department shall submit a report, in 63 
accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, 64 
to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having 65 
cognizance of matters relating to public safety, identifying the essential 66 
components and documentation required for such reports and 67 
indicating how the department will simplify the required 68 
documentation. The department shall implement new requirements 69 
for documentation for reports, pursuant to the department's findings, 70 
not later than July 1, 2020. 71 
(b) The Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection 72 
and the School Safety Infrastructure Council, established under section 73 
10-292r of the general statutes, shall evaluate and seek methods to 74 
simplify the documentation required of applicants for the school 75 
security infrastructure competitive grant program. Not later than 76 
January 1, 2020, the department and council shall submit a report, in 77 
accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, 78 
to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having 79 
cognizance of matters relating to public safety, identifying the essential 80 
components and documentation required for such applications and 81 
indicating how the department will simplify the required 82 
documentation. The department and council shall implement new 83 
requirements for documentation for reports, pursuant to the 84 
department's and council's findings, not later than July 1, 2020. 85  Raised Bill No.  7291 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5088   	4 of 4 
 
Sec. 3. Section 29-452 of the general statutes is repealed and the 86 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2019): 87 
The Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection shall 88 
develop criteria to identify qualified school security consultants 89 
operating in this state. The department shall establish and maintain a 90 
registry of [school security consultants operating in the state] such 91 
consultants. The registry shall contain the names and employers of 92 
qualified school security consultants and such other information as the 93 
Commissioner of Emergency Services and Public Protection may 94 
require. Such registry shall be updated at least annually by the 95 
department, be made available to the public upon request and be 96 
published on the department's Internet web site.  97 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage 10-222n 
Sec. 2 from passage New section 
Sec. 3 October 1, 2019 29-452 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To (1) require the Department of Emergency Services and Public 
Protection to update school security and safety plan standards, (2) 
require the department to report on and implement simplified 
documentation requirements for reporting by local and regional 
boards of education on school security and safety plans and drills, (3) 
require the department and the School Safety Infrastructure Council to 
report on and implement simplified documentation requirements for 
school security infrastructure grants, and (4) require the department to 
develop criteria to identify qualified school security consultants. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, 
except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is 
not underlined.]