Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB07338 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/07/2019

                        
 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5538  	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 7338  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 5538 
 
 
Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(HS)  
 
 
AN ACT INCREASING FUNDING FOR ELDERLY NUTRITION, 
ENSURING EQUITABLE R ATES FOR PROVIDERS O F MEALS ON 
WHEELS AND COLLECTIN G DATA ON MALNUTRITION. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 17b-343 of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2019): 2 
The Commissioner of Social Services shall establish annually the 3 
maximum allowable rate to be paid by agencies for homemaker 4 
services, chore person services, companion services, respite care, meals 5 
on wheels, adult day care services, case management and assessment 6 
services, transportation, mental health counseling and elderly foster 7 
care. [, except that the maximum allowable rates in effect July 1, 1990, 8 
shall remain in effect during the fiscal years ending June 30, 1992, and 9 
June 30, 1993.] The Commissioner of Social Services shall prescribe 10 
uniform forms on which agencies providing such services shall report 11 
their costs for such services. Such rates shall be determined on the 12 
basis of a reasonable payment for necessary services rendered. The 13 
maximum allowable rates established by the Commissioner of Social 14 
Services for the Connecticut home-care program for the elderly 15 
established under section 17b-342 shall constitute the rates required 16  Raised Bill No.  7338 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5538   	2 of 4 
 
under this section until revised in accordance with this section. The 17 
Commissioner of Social Services shall establish a fee schedule, to be 18 
effective on and after July 1, 1994, for homemaker services, chore 19 
person services, companion services, respite care, meals on wheels, 20 
adult day care services, case management and assessment services, 21 
transportation, mental health counseling and elderly foster care. The 22 
commissioner may annually increase [any fee in] the fee schedule 23 
based on an increase in the cost of services. The commissioner shall 24 
increase the fee schedule effective July 1, 2000, by not less than five per 25 
cent, for adult day care services. The commissioner shall increase the 26 
fee schedule effective July 1, 2011, by four dollars per person, per day 27 
for adult day care services. Effective July 1, 2019, and annually 28 
thereafter, the commissioner shall increase the fee schedule for meals 29 
on wheels providers serving participants in the Connecticut home-care 30 
program for the elderly by, at minimum, the cost-of-living adjustment 31 
as measured by the consumer price index. The commissioner may 32 
increase any fee payable to a meals on wheels provider upon the 33 
application of such provider evidencing extraordinary costs related to 34 
delivery of meals on wheels in sparsely populated rural regions of the 35 
state. Nothing contained in this section shall authorize a payment by 36 
the state to any agency for such services in excess of the amount 37 
charged by such agency for such services to the general public.  38 
Sec. 2. Subsection (c) of section 17a-305 of the general statutes is 39 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 40 
1, 2019): 41 
(c) The Department of Rehabilitation Services, in consultation with 42 
the five area agencies on aging [,] and elderly nutrition providers, shall 43 
review the method of allocation set forth in [subsection (a) of this 44 
section and shall report any findings or recommendations to the joint 45 
standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of 46 
matters relating to appropriations and the budgets of state agencies 47 
and human services] subsections (a) and (b) of this section and 48 
evaluate the formula used to allocate funding for elderly nutrition 49 
programs based on factors including, but not limited to: (1) Elderly 50  Raised Bill No.  7338 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5538   	3 of 4 
 
population data from the 2020 census and the American Community 51 
Survey conducted by the United States Census Bureau for the five 52 
elderly planning and service areas as described in section 17a-304, and 53 
(2) any increased costs for providers that deliver meals on wheels in 54 
sparsely populated rural regions. Not later than July 1, 2021, the 55 
department shall report, in accordance with the provisions of section 56 
11-4a, to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having 57 
cognizance of matters relating to aging, appropriations and the 58 
budgets of state agencies and human services on (A) the rates of 59 
reimbursement for each meals on wheels provider in the state 60 
compared to the costs to provide meals on wheels for each such 61 
provider, (B) the administrative expenses of each such meals on wheels 62 
provider, (C) the number of meals on wheels providers that have 63 
reduced or eliminated deliveries based on inadeq uate state 64 
reimbursement, and (D) any recommended changes in the method of 65 
allocation or funding formula. 66 
Sec. 3. Subdivision (12) of subsection (b) of section 19a-127l of the 67 
general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu 68 
thereof (Effective July 1, 2019): 69 
(12) [Any] Recommendations concerning the collection and analysis 70 
of data on patient malnutrition for the purposes of improving quality 71 
of care and any other issues that the department deems appropriate. 72 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2019 17b-343 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2019 17a-305(c) 
Sec. 3 July 1, 2019 19a-127l(b)(12) 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To increase funding for elderly nutrition, ensure equitable rates for 
providers of meals on wheels and collect and analyze data on 
malnutrition.  Raised Bill No.  7338 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5538   	4 of 4 
 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, 
except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is 
not underlined.]