Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00360 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/12/2019

                     
 
 
LCO No. 5778   	1 of 2 
  
General Assembly  Committee Bill No. 360  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 5778 
 
 
Referred to Committee on LABOR AND PUBLIC EMPLOYEES  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(LAB)  
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TH E PROCESSING OF WORK O PPORTUNITY 
TAX CREDIT APPLICATIONS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2019) (a) The Department of Labor 1 
shall: (1) Process forty per cent of all Work Opportunity Tax Credits 2 
submitted and in its possession not later than July 1, 2020, (2) process 3 
sixty per cent of all Work Opportunity Tax Credits submitted and in its 4 
possession not later than July 1, 2021, (3) process eighty per cent of all 5 
Work Opportunity Tax Credits submitted and in its possession not 6 
later than July 1, 2022, and (4) process one hundred per cent of all 7 
Work Opportunity Tax Credits submitted and in its possession not 8 
later than July 1, 2023.  9 
(b) Not later than July 1, 2020, the Department of Labor shall pursue 10 
a method to receive and process all applications for Work Opportunity 11 
Tax Credits electronically. Such method shall include the ability to 12 
receive or access information electronically held by other relevant state 13 
agencies. 14    
Committee Bill No.  360 
 
 
LCO No. 5778   	2 of 2 
 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2019 New section 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To require the Labor Department to process applications for the Work 
Opportunity Tax Credit and issue the tax credit certifications in a 
timely manner. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, 
except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is 
not underlined.] 
 
Co-Sponsors:  SEN. FORMICA, 20th Dist.  
 
S.B. 360