Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00527 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/22/2019

                     
 
 
LCO No. 6442   	1 of 4 
  
General Assembly  Committee Bill No. 527  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 6442 
 
 
Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(PD)  
 
 
 
AN ACT PERMITTING MUNICIPALITIES TO COMBINE THE 
PROPERTY ASSESSMENTS OF MULTIPLE ELECTRIC GENERATING 
FACILITIES. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 32-71a of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage, and 2 
applicable to assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2018): 3 
(a) Any electric generating facility, the construction of which is 4 
completed after July 1, 1998, may be treated for the purposes of section 5 
32-71 as if it were located in an enterprise zone and used for 6 
commercial or retail purposes. Notwithstanding the provisions of 7 
section 32-71, upon the approval of a municipality's legislative body, 8 
either before or after July 1, 2001, the full amount of either assessments 9 
or taxes may be fixed for the real and personal property of such electric 10 
generating facility both during and after the construction period, 11 
provided such assessments or taxes as so fixed represent an 12 
approximation of the projected tax liability of such facility based on a 13 
reasonable estimation of its fair market value as determined by the 14 
municipality upon the exercise of its best efforts. 15    
Committee Bill No.  527 
 
 
LCO No. 6442   	2 of 4 
 
(b) Any new electric generating facility, the construction of which is 16 
completed after July 1, 2003, may be treated for the purposes of section 17 
32-71 as if it were located in an enterprise zone and used for 18 
commercial or retail purposes, provided: (1) The owner of such facility 19 
has negotiated a tax agreement with the municipality in which such 20 
facility would be located; and (2) such agreement has been approved 21 
by the municipality's legislative body between January 1, 2002, and 22 
February 28, 2002. Notwithstanding the provisions of section 32-71, 23 
upon approval of such municipality's legislative body, either before or 24 
after June 14, 2002, up to the full amount of either assessments or taxes 25 
may be fixed for the real and personal property of such electric 26 
generating facility both during and after the construction period, 27 
provided such assessments or taxes as so fixed represent an 28 
approximation of the commensurate portion of the projected tax 29 
liability of such facility based on a reasonable estimation of its fair 30 
market value as determined by the municipality upon the exercise of 31 
its best efforts. 32 
(c) Any new electric generating facility, the construction of which is 33 
completed after July 1, 2003, may be treated for the purposes of section 34 
32-71 as if it were located in an enterprise zone and used for 35 
commercial or retail purposes, provided the municipality in which 36 
such facility is located is under state governance. Notwithstanding the 37 
provisions of section 32-71, upon approval of such municipality's 38 
legislative body, either before or after June 14, 2002, up to the full 39 
amount of either assessments or taxes may be fixed for the real and 40 
personal property of such electric generating facility both during and 41 
after the construction period, provided such assessments or taxes as so 42 
fixed represent an approximation of the commensurate portion of the 43 
projected tax liability of such facility based on a reasonable estimation 44 
of its fair market value as determined by the municipality upon the 45 
exercise of its best efforts. 46 
(d) Any existing electric generating facility, the construction of 47 
which is completed before July 1, 1998, and any new electric 48    
Committee Bill No.  527 
 
 
LCO No. 6442   	3 of 4 
 
generating facility, the construction of which is completed after July 1, 49 
2019, which new electric generating facility is constructed at the same 50 
location as such existing electric generating facility, may be treated 51 
collectively as one combined electric generating facility for the 52 
purposes of section 32-71 as if such combined electric generating 53 
facility were located in an enterprise zone and used for commercial or 54 
retail purposes. Notwithstanding the provisions of section 32-71, upon 55 
the approval, either before or after July 1, 2019, of the legislative body 56 
of the municipality in which such combined electric generating facility 57 
is located, the full amount of either assessments or taxes may be fixed 58 
for the real and personal property of both such existing and new 59 
electric generating facilities before, during and after the construction 60 
period of such new electric generating facility, provided such 61 
assessments or taxes as so fixed represent an approximation of the 62 
projected tax liability of such combined electric generating facility 63 
based on a reasonable estimation of its fair market value as determined 64 
by the municipality upon the exercise of its best efforts. 65 
[(d)] (e) As used in this section, "electric generating facility" means a 66 
facility, as defined in subdivision (3) of subsection (a) of section 16-50i.  67 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage, and 
applicable to assessment 
years commencing on and 
after October 1, 2018 
32-71a 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To permit municipalities to combine real and personal property 
assessments of multiple electric generating facilities. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, 
except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is 
not underlined.] 
 
Co-Sponsors:  SEN. LESSER, 9th Dist.; SEN. ABRAMS, 13th Dist. 
REP. SERRA, 33rd Dist.; REP. PHIPPS, 100th Dist.     
Committee Bill No.  527 
 
 
LCO No. 6442   	4 of 4 
 
 
S.B. 527