Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00548 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/22/2019

                     
 
LCO No. 6176   	1 of 5 
  
General Assembly  Committee Bill No. 548  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 6176 
 
 
Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(PD)  
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING CO MMUNITY EMPOWERMENT AND 
NEIGHBORHOOD ASSISTA NCE. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective October 1, 2019) The chief executive 1 
officer of each municipality (1) with a population of more than one 2 
hundred thousand, as enumerated in the 2010 federal decennial 3 
census, and (2) having a total area of not more than thirty square miles, 4 
shall establish and appoint members to one community investment 5 
board for each neighborhood in the municipality. Each community 6 
investment board may be comprised of, but need not be limited to, 7 
residents, business owners, religious leaders, community development 8 
corporation representatives and community group representatives. 9 
Such boards shall identify priorities for the use of municipal revenue 10 
sharing grants awarded pursuant to section 4-66l of the general 11 
statutes, as amended by this act, and section 12-18c of the general 12 
statutes, as amended by this act. 13 
Sec. 2. Section 4-66l of the general statutes is amended by adding 14 
subsection (j) as follows (Effective October 1, 2022): 15    
Committee Bill No.  548 
 
 
LCO No. 6176   	2 of 5 
 
(NEW) (j) On and after October 1, 2022, any municipal revenue 16 
sharing grant awarded pursuant to this section to a municipality 17 
whose chief executive officer has established community investment 18 
boards pursuant to section 1 of this act may be expended by such 19 
municipality as follows: (1) Thirty-five per cent of such grant shall be 20 
expended on priorities identified by such community investment 21 
boards, (2) thirty-five per cent of such grant shall be expended on 22 
priorities identified by the legislative body of the municipality, and (3) 23 
thirty per cent of such grant shall be expended on priorities jointly 24 
agreed upon by such community investment boards and the legislative 25 
body of the municipality. 26 
Sec. 3. Section 12-18c of the general statutes is repealed and the 27 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2019): 28 
(a) There is established an account to be known as the "select 29 
payment in lieu of taxes account" which shall be a separate, nonlapsing 30 
account within the General Fund. The account shall contain any 31 
moneys required by law to be deposited in the account. Moneys in the 32 
account shall be expended by the Office of Policy and Management for 33 
the purposes of making select grants to municipalities and districts for 34 
payments in lieu of taxes as provided for in subdivision (1) of 35 
subsection (e) of section 12-18b, subparagraphs (B) and (C) of 36 
subdivision (2) of subsection (e) of section 12-18b, subdivision (3) of 37 
subsection (e) of section 12-18b and for any other purpose expressly 38 
provided by law. 39 
(b) Any select grant for payment in lieu of taxes awarded to a 40 
municipality whose chief executive officer has established community 41 
investment boards pursuant to section 1 of this act may be expended 42 
by such municipality as provided in subsection (j) of section 4-66l, as 43 
amended by this act. 44 
Sec. 4. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2019) (a) Not later than January 1, 45 
2021, the Office of Policy and Management shall create and maintain 46 
an Internet web site to allow residents and organizations to submit 47    
Committee Bill No.  548 
 
 
LCO No. 6176   	3 of 5 
 
proposals for solutions to problems specific to urban areas to the Office 48 
of Policy and Management. 49 
(b) If the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management, or the 50 
secretary's designee, determines that a proposal submitted through the 51 
Internet web site created pursuant to subsection (a) of this subsection 52 
is viable, the secretary shall (1) identify a municipality or 53 
neighborhood in which to establish a pilot program to implement the 54 
proposal, (2) establish the pilot program in such municipality or 55 
neighborhood, (3) monitor the implementation of the pilot program, 56 
and (4) assess the results of the pilot program. 57 
(c) The Office of Policy and Management shall, within available 58 
appropriations, provide a monetary award to each resident or 59 
organization that submits a proposal through the Internet web site 60 
created pursuant to subsection (a) of this section, if the secretary, or the 61 
secretary's designee, determines that a pilot program established to 62 
implement the proposal was successful after assessing the results of 63 
the pilot program pursuant to subsection (b) of this section. 64 
Sec. 5. (Effective July 1, 2019) (a) There is established a task force to 65 
study the (1) programs for which state funding is utilized by nonprofit 66 
providers, and (2) requirements imposed on nonprofit providers by 67 
state agencies and compliance with those requirements by nonprofit 68 
providers. 69 
(b) The task force shall consist of the following members: 70 
(1) Two appointed by the speaker of the House of Representatives; 71 
(2) Two appointed by the president pro tempore of the Senate; 72 
(3) Two appointed by the majority leader of the House of 73 
Representatives; 74 
(4) Two appointed by the majority leader of the Senate; 75    
Committee Bill No.  548 
 
 
LCO No. 6176   	4 of 5 
 
(5) Two appointed by the minority leader of the House of 76 
Representatives; and 77 
(6) Two appointed by the minority leader of the Senate. 78 
(c) Any member of the task force appointed under subdivision (1), 79 
(2), (3), (4), (5) or (6) of subsection (b) of this section may be a member 80 
of the General Assembly. 81 
(d) All appointments to the task force shall be made not later than 82 
thirty days after the effective date of this section. Any vacancy shall be 83 
filled by the appointing authority. 84 
(e) The speaker of the House of Representatives and the president 85 
pro tempore of the Senate shall select the chairpersons of the task force 86 
from among the members of the task force. Such chairpersons shall 87 
schedule the first meeting of the task force, which shall be held not 88 
later than sixty days after the effective date of this section. 89 
(f) The administrative staff of the joint standing committee of the 90 
General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to planning 91 
and development shall serve as administrative staff of the task force. 92 
(g) Not later than January 1, 2020, the task force shall submit a 93 
report on its findings and any recommendations to the joint standing 94 
committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters 95 
relating to planning and development, in accordance with the 96 
provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes. The task force shall 97 
terminate on the date that it submits such report or January 1, 2020, 98 
whichever is later. 99 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2019 New section 
Sec. 2 October 1, 2022 4-66l 
Sec. 3 October 1, 2019 12-18c    
Committee Bill No.  548 
 
 
LCO No. 6176   	5 of 5 
 
Sec. 4 July 1, 2019 New section 
Sec. 5 July 1, 2019 New section 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To (1) require certain municipalities to establish community 
investment boards and to use a certain percentage of grant funding 
received through the municipal revenue sharing account and the select 
payment in lieu of taxes account for the priorities of such boards, (2) 
require the Office of Policy and Management to establish an Internet 
web site for the submission of proposals for solutions to urban-area 
problems and authorize the Secretary of the Office of Policy and 
Management to establish pilot programs to implement certain 
proposals, and (3) establish a task force to study issues concerning 
nonprofit providers. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, 
except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is 
not underlined.] 
 
Co-Sponsors:  SEN. FASANO, 34th Dist.  
 
S.B. 548