Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00548 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/17/2019

                     
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00548-R02-
SB.docx  
1 of 5 
 
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 548  
January Session, 2019 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING CO MMUNITY EMPOWERMENT AND 
NEIGHBORHOOD ASSISTA NCE.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective October 1, 2019) (a) Except as provided in 1 
subsection (b) of this section, in each municipality with a population of 2 
more than sixty thousand, as enumerated in the 2010 federal decennial 3 
census, and having a total area of not more than thirty square miles, 4 
the chief executive officer of such municipality shall establish and 5 
appoint members to one community investment board for each 6 
neighborhood in the municipality. Each community investment board 7 
may be comprised of, but need not be limited to, residents, business 8 
owners, religious leaders, community development corporation 9 
representatives and community group representatives. Such boards 10 
shall identify priorities for the use of municipal revenue sharing grants 11 
awarded pursuant to section 4-66l of the general statutes, as amended 12 
by this act, and select grants for payment in lieu of taxes awarded 13 
pursuant to section 12-18c of the general statutes, as amended by this 14 
act. 15 
(b) If any municipality described in subsection (a) of this section has 16 
established a neighborhood revitalization zone for a neighborhood 17 
pursuant to section 7-600 of the general statutes, the chief executive 18 
officer of such municipality shall designate the neighborhood 19  Substitute Bill No. 548 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00548-
R02-SB.docx }   
2 of 5 
 
revitalization planning committee of such neighborhood, as described 20 
in section 7-601 of the general statutes, as the community investment 21 
board for such neighborhood for the purposes of carrying out the 22 
provisions of said subsection. 23 
Sec. 2. Section 4-66l of the general statutes is amended by adding 24 
subsection (j) as follows (Effective October 1, 2022): 25 
(NEW) (j) On and after October 1, 2022, any municipal revenue 26 
sharing grant awarded pursuant to this section to a municipality 27 
whose chief executive officer has established or designated community 28 
investment boards pursuant to section 1 of this act may be expended 29 
by such municipality as follows: (1) Thirty-five per cent of such grant 30 
shall be expended on priorities identified by such community 31 
investment boards, (2) thirty-five per cent of such grant shall be 32 
expended on priorities identified by the legislative body of the 33 
municipality, and (3) thirty per cent of such grant shall be expended on 34 
priorities jointly agreed upon by such community investment boards 35 
and the legislative body of the municipality. 36 
Sec. 3. Section 12-18c of the general statutes is repealed and the 37 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2019): 38 
(a) There is established an account to be known as the "select 39 
payment in lieu of taxes account" which shall be a separate, nonlapsing 40 
account within the General Fund. The account shall contain any 41 
moneys required by law to be deposited in the account. Moneys in the 42 
account shall be expended by the Office of Policy and Management for 43 
the purposes of making select grants to municipalities and districts for 44 
payments in lieu of taxes as provided for in subdivision (1) of 45 
subsection (e) of section 12-18b, subparagraphs (B) and (C) of 46 
subdivision (2) of subsection (e) of section 12-18b, subdivision (3) of 47 
subsection (e) of section 12-18b and for any other purpose expressly 48 
provided by law. 49 
(b) Any select grant for payment in lieu of taxes awarded to a 50  Substitute Bill No. 548 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00548-
R02-SB.docx }   
3 of 5 
 
municipality whose chief executive officer has established or 51 
designated community investment boards pursuant to section 1 of this 52 
act may be expended by such municipality as provided in subsection 53 
(j) of section 4-66l, as amended by this act. 54 
Sec. 4. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2019) (a) Not later than January 1, 55 
2021, the Office of Policy and Management shall create and maintain 56 
an Internet web site to allow residents and organizations to submit 57 
proposals for solutions to problems specific to urban areas to the Office 58 
of Policy and Management. 59 
(b) If the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management, or the 60 
secretary's designee, determines that a proposal submitted through the 61 
Internet web site created pursuant to subsection (a) of this subsection 62 
is viable, the secretary shall (1) identify a municipality or 63 
neighborhood in which to establish a pilot program to implement the 64 
proposal, (2) establish the pilot program in such municipality or 65 
neighborhood, (3) monitor the implementation of the pilot program, 66 
and (4) assess the results of the pilot program. 67 
(c) The Office of Policy and Management shall, within available 68 
appropriations, provide a monetary award to each resident or 69 
organization that submits a proposal through the Internet web site 70 
created pursuant to subsection (a) of this section, if the secretary, or the 71 
secretary's designee, determines that a pilot program established to 72 
implement the proposal was successful after assessing the results of 73 
the pilot program pursuant to subsection (b) of this section. 74 
Sec. 5. (Effective July 1, 2019) (a) There is established a task force to 75 
study the (1) programs for which state funding is utilized by nonprofit 76 
providers, and (2) requirements imposed on nonprofit providers by 77 
state agencies and compliance with those requirements by nonprofit 78 
providers. 79 
(b) The task force shall consist of the following members: 80 
(1) Two appointed by the speaker of the House of Representatives; 81  Substitute Bill No. 548 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00548-
R02-SB.docx }   
4 of 5 
 
(2) Two appointed by the president pro tempore of the Senate; 82 
(3) Two appointed by the majority leader of the House of 83 
Representatives; 84 
(4) Two appointed by the majority leader of the Senate; 85 
(5) Two appointed by the minority leader of the House of 86 
Representatives; and 87 
(6) Two appointed by the minority leader of the Senate. 88 
(c) Any member of the task force appointed under subdivision (1), 89 
(2), (3), (4), (5) or (6) of subsection (b) of this section may be a member 90 
of the General Assembly. 91 
(d) All appointments to the task force shall be made not later than 92 
thirty days after the effective date of this section. Any vacancy shall be 93 
filled by the appointing authority. 94 
(e) The speaker of the House of Representatives and the president 95 
pro tempore of the Senate shall select the chairpersons of the task force 96 
from among the members of the task force. Such chairpersons shall 97 
schedule the first meeting of the task force, which shall be held not 98 
later than sixty days after the effective date of this section. 99 
(f) The administrative staff of the joint standing committee of the 100 
General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to planning 101 
and development shall serve as administrative staff of the task force. 102 
(g) Not later than January 1, 2020, the task force shall submit a 103 
report on its findings and any recommendations to the joint standing 104 
committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters 105 
relating to planning and development, in accordance with the 106 
provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes. The task force shall 107 
terminate on the date that it submits such report or January 1, 2020, 108 
whichever is later. 109  Substitute Bill No. 548 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00548-
R02-SB.docx }   
5 of 5 
 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2019 New section 
Sec. 2 October 1, 2022 4-66l 
Sec. 3 October 1, 2019 12-18c 
Sec. 4 July 1, 2019 New section 
Sec. 5 July 1, 2019 New section 
 
Statement of Legislative Commissioners:   
In Section 1(a), "select grants for payment in lieu of taxes pursuant to" 
was inserted before "section 12-18c" for clarity. 
 
PD Joint Favorable Subst.