Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00590 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 02/20/2019

                     
 
 
LCO No. 4466   	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Committee Bill No. 590  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 4466 
 
 
Referred to Committee on ENVIRONMENT  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(ENV)  
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TH E SELECTION OF CATERER S FOR 
INDIVIDUALS WHO RENT STATE-OWNED VENUES. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 23-26 of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2019): 2 
(a) The commissioner may (1) provide for the collection of fees for 3 
parking, admission, boat launching and other uses of state parks, 4 
forests, boat launches and other state recreational facilities, (2) 5 
establish from time to time the daily and seasonal amount thereof, (3) 6 
enter into contractual relations with other persons for the operation of 7 
concessions, (4) establish other sources of revenue to be derived from 8 
services to the general public using such parks, forests and facilities, 9 
(5) employ such assistants as may be necessary for the collection of 10 
such revenue. The commissioner shall deposit such revenue derived 11 
therefrom with the State Treasurer in the Passport to the Parks account 12 
established pursuant to section 23-15h. On and after July 1, 1992, any 13 
increase in any fee or any establishment of a new fee under this section 14 
shall be by regulations adopted in accordance with the provisions of 15 
chapter 54. Not later than May 1, 2010, said commissioner shall 16    
Committee Bill No.  590 
 
 
LCO No. 4466   	2 of 4 
 
establish the daily and seasonal amount of such parking, admission, 17 
boat launching and other use fees for residents of this state in amounts 18 
not greater than one hundred thirty-five per cent of the amounts 19 
charged for such fees by said commissioner as of April 1, 2009. Not 20 
later than May 1, 2010, said commissioner shall establish the daily and 21 
seasonal amount of such parking, admission, boat launching and other 22 
use fees for nonresidents of this state in amounts not greater than one 23 
hundred fifty per cent of the amounts charged for such fees by said 24 
commissioner as of April 1, 2009. Notwithstanding the provisions of 25 
this section, the commissioner may enter into an agreement with any 26 
municipality under which the municipality may retain fees collected 27 
by municipal officers at state boat launches when state employees are 28 
not on duty. Nothing in this subsection shall be construed to require 29 
any person who rents a venue at a state park or other facility to utilize 30 
the services of any caterer who may otherwise have a contract with the 31 
commissioner to provide catering services at such venue. 32 
(b) Notwithstanding the provisions of subsection (a) of this section, 33 
the commissioner may establish fees for the public use of the mansion 34 
at Harkness Memorial State Park in Waterford, the Ellie Mitchell 35 
Pavilion at Rocky Neck State Park in East Lyme and Gillette Castle 36 
State Park in East Haddam provided no fee shall be charged to any 37 
group organized as a nonprofit corporation under 26 USC 501(c)(3) for 38 
purposes of providing support to such parks or facilities and further 39 
provided the commissioner shall specify procedures and criteria for 40 
the selection of any private business which is engaged by the state to 41 
provide services during any such public use, including, but not limited 42 
to, catering services. Such fees, procedures and criteria shall be 43 
effective until June 30, 1999, or until regulations are adopted, 44 
whichever is sooner. Regulations implementing such fees, procedures 45 
and criteria shall be adopted in accordance with the provisions of 46 
chapter 54 on or before July 1, 1999. Such fees shall be comparable with 47 
rents and charges of similar properties based on fair market rates. 48 
Nothing in this subsection shall be construed to require any person 49 
who rents a venue at a state park or other facility to utilize the services 50    
Committee Bill No.  590 
 
 
LCO No. 4466   	3 of 4 
 
of any caterer who may otherwise have a contract with the 51 
commissioner to provide catering services at such venue. 52 
(c) The commissioner shall issue to any nonresident of the state, 53 
upon payment of a fee established by said commissioner, a 54 
nontransferable Connecticut private passenger motor vehicle pass 55 
which permits free parking throughout the calendar year at any state 56 
park, forest, boat launch or other state recreational facility, provided 57 
the commissioner shall not be required to issue such a pass to any 58 
park, forest or facility which is wholly managed by a private 59 
concessionaire and may require payment of fees for special events. Not 60 
later than May 1, 2010, said commissioner shall establish the amount of 61 
such fee for nonresidents of this state in an amount not greater than 62 
one hundred fifty per cent of the amount charged for such fee by said 63 
commissioner as of April 1, 2009. 64 
(d) The commissioner shall issue to any resident of the state who is 65 
sixty-five years of age or older and to any resident of this state who is a 66 
disabled veteran, as defined in section 14-254, or under federal law, 67 
without fee, upon application of such resident, a nontransferable 68 
lifetime pass which shall permit free admission and boat access 69 
parking for use at any state park, forest or state recreational facility, 70 
provided the commissioner shall not be required to issue such a pass 71 
for use of any park, forest or facility which is wholly managed by a 72 
private concessionaire and may require payment of fees for special 73 
events. 74 
(e) Notwithstanding any provision of this section, any person with a 75 
valid Connecticut motor vehicle license plate shall not pay a parking 76 
fee at any state park, forest or other state recreational facility on and 77 
after January 1, 2018.  78 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2019 23-26    
Committee Bill No.  590 
 
 
LCO No. 4466   	4 of 4 
 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To allow persons who rent state-owned venues in parks and other 
locations to use the caterer of their own choice. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, 
except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is 
not underlined.] 
 
Co-Sponsors:  SEN. OSTEN, 19th Dist.; REP. RYAN, 139th Dist.  
 
S.B. 590