Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00685 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/03/2019

                     
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00685-R02-
SB.docx  
1 of 3 
 
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 685  
January Session, 2019 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT ESTABLISHING THE CONNECTICUT APPR ENTICESHIP AND 
EDUCATION COMMITTEE.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 10-21j of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2019): 2 
(a) The Commissioner of Education, in collaboration with the Board 3 
of Regents for Higher Education, shall establish [a committee to 4 
coordinate the education of middle school and high school students 5 
about careers in manufacturing] the Connecticut Apprenticeship and 6 
Education Committee to identify opportunities for integrating 7 
preapprenticeship and apprenticeship training programs in the 8 
curricula of technical education and career schools, middle schools and 9 
high schools. Such committee shall include, but not be limited to, (1) 10 
representatives from the Department of Economic and Community 11 
Development, the Labor Department, the Connecticut Center for 12 
Advanced Technology, the Technical Education and Career System, 13 
the Connecticut Manufacturers Collaborative, the advanced 14 
manufacturing centers at the regional community-technical colleges, 15 
independent institutions of higher education in the state that offer 16 
training in the field of manufacturing, the Connecticut Employment 17 
and Training Commission, manufacturing companies and employee 18 
organizations that represent manufacturing workers, and (2) [middle 19  Substitute Bill No. 685 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00685-
R02-SB.docx }   
2 of 3 
 
and high] school teachers, guidance counselors, [and] school 20 
counselors, school principals and school superintendents. 21 
(b) [On or before January 1, 2017, and on or before August first 22 
annually thereafter, the] The committee established pursuant to 23 
subsection (a) of this section shall, [compile a catalog of programs at 24 
public and independent institutions of higher education in the state 25 
that offer training in the field of manufacturing. Such catalog shall 26 
include for each program: (1) The degree, certification, license or 27 
credential awarded upon completion; (2) the period of time and 28 
requirements for completion; (3) the enrollment process; and (4) the 29 
cost of attendance. The commissioner shall make such catalog 30 
available on the Internet web site of the Department of Education and 31 
distribute such catalog to each local and regional board of education] 32 
in consultation with members of the manufacturing, insurance, health 33 
care, science, technology, including, but not limited to, financial 34 
technology and biotechnology, engineering, mathematics, construction 35 
trades and hospitality industries, (1) evaluate whether existing 36 
preapprenticeship and apprenticeship training programs available to 37 
state residents meet workforce needs, and (2) identify and review 38 
alternative preapprenticeship and apprenticeship training programs, 39 
including, but not limited to, European apprenticeship training 40 
programs. 41 
(c) On or before [February 1, 2017] July 1, 2020, and annually 42 
thereafter, the committee established pursuant to subsection (a) of this 43 
section shall report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a, 44 
to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having 45 
cognizance of matters relating to commerce, [and] higher education 46 
and [workforce development an analysis of whether current programs 47 
available to Connecticut students are meeting workforce needs. The 48 
committee shall consult with members of the manufacturing industry 49 
when producing such report] employment advancement and labor and 50 
public employees on subdivisions (1) and (2) of subsection (b) of this 51 
section. 52  Substitute Bill No. 685 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00685-
R02-SB.docx }   
3 of 3 
 
(d) The Commissioner of Education, in consultation with the 53 
committee established pursuant to subsection (a) of this section, shall 54 
[develop and administer a program to] introduce middle school and 55 
high school students, their parents or guardians, guidance counselors 56 
and school counselors to careers in [manufacturing. Such program 57 
may include, but is not limited to, hands-on learning opportunities, 58 
posters, videos, pamphlets and social media and other technology to 59 
describe and promote modern manufacturing and the programs 60 
included in the catalog] the industries described in subsection (b) of 61 
this section. The commissioner may enter into partnerships with one or 62 
more private sector entities to further the goals of [such program. Such 63 
partnerships may include, but are not limited to, student visits to 64 
manufacturers and manufacturer visits to schools in order to give 65 
students first hand exposure to modern manufacturing and the 66 
products and materials created by manufacturers in the state] this 67 
section. 68 
(e) The Department of Education, in consultation with 69 
representatives from the [manufacturing industry and the Connecticut 70 
Center for Advanced Technology] industries described in subsection 71 
(b) of this section, shall develop a best practices guide to help local and 72 
regional boards of education to incorporate relationships with 73 
[manufacturing] the industries described in subsection (b) of this 74 
section in their middle school and high school curricula.  75 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2019 10-21j 
 
HED Joint Favorable Subst.