Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00861 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/28/2019

                     
 
LCO 3767  \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00861-R01-
SB.docx  
1 of 3 
  
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 861  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 3767 
 
 
Referred to Committee on VETERANS' AFFAIRS  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(VA)  
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TH E DEFINITION OF "SERVICE IN TIME OF 
WAR" AND STATE RESID ENCY REQUIREMENTS FO R CERTAIN 
VETERANS' SERVICES.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subsections (a) and (b) of section 27-103 of the general 1 
statutes are repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof 2 
(Effective October 1, 2019): 3 
(a) As used in the general statutes, except chapter 504, and except as 4 
otherwise provided: (1) "Armed forces" means the United States Army, 5 
Navy, Marine Corps, Coast Guard and Air Force and any reserve 6 
component thereof, including the Connecticut National Guard 7 
performing duty as provided in Title 32 of the United States Code, as 8 
amended from time to time; (2) "veteran" means any person honorably 9 
discharged from, or released under honorable conditions from active 10 
service in, the armed forces; (3) "service in time of war" means service 11 
of ninety or more cumulative days [except, if the period of war lasted 12 
less than ninety days, "service in time of war" means service for the 13 
entire period of war,] during a period of war unless separated from 14 
service earlier because of an injury incurred or aggravated in the line 15  Raised Bill No. 861 
 
 
LCO 3767  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00861-
R01-SB.docx }   
2 of 3 
 
of duty or a service-connected disability rated by the United States 16 
Department of Veterans Affairs, [during a period of war] except that if 17 
the period of war lasted less than ninety days, "service in time of war" 18 
means service for the entire such period of war unless separated 19 
because of any such injury or disability; (4) "period of war" has the 20 
same meaning as provided in 38 USC 101, as amended from time to 21 
time, except that the "Vietnam Era" means the period beginning on 22 
February 28, 1961, and ending on July 1, 1975, in all cases; and "period 23 
of war" shall include service while engaged in combat or a combat 24 
support role in Lebanon, July 1, 1958, to November 1, 1958, or 25 
September 29, 1982, to March 30, 1984; Grenada, October 25, 1983, to 26 
December 15, 1983; Operation Earnest Will, involving the escort of 27 
Kuwaiti oil tankers flying the United States flag in the Persian Gulf, 28 
July 24, 1987, to August 1, 1990; and Panama, December 20, 1989, to 29 
January 31, 1990, and shall include service during such periods with 30 
the armed forces of any government associated with the United States; 31 
and (5) "qualifying condition" means a diagnosis of post-traumatic 32 
stress disorder or traumatic brain injury made by, or an experience of 33 
military sexual trauma, as described in 38 USC 1720D, as amended 34 
from time to time, disclosed to, an individual licensed to provide 35 
health care services at a United States Department of Veterans Affairs 36 
facility. 37 
(b) As used in this part, "Veterans Residential Services facility" 38 
means the Veterans Residential Services facility in Rocky Hill 39 
maintained by the Department of Veterans Affairs that provides 40 
temporary and other supported residential services for qualifying 41 
veterans; "hospital" means any incorporated hospital or tuberculosis 42 
sanatorium in the state and any state chronic disease hospital, or 43 
hospital for persons with mental illness; "Healthcare Center" means the 44 
hospital in Rocky Hill maintained by the Department of Veterans 45 
Affairs; "veteran" means any veteran, as defined in subsection (a) of 46 
this section, who is a resident of this state; [, provided, if he or she was 47 
not a resident or resident alien of this state at the time of enlistment or 48 
induction into the armed forces, he or she shall have resided 49  Raised Bill No. 861 
 
 
LCO 3767  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00861-
R01-SB.docx }   
3 of 3 
 
continuously in this state for at least two years;] "eligible dependent" 50 
means any parent, wife or husband, or child of a veteran who has no 51 
adequate means of support; and "eligible family member" means any 52 
parent, brother or sister, wife or husband, or child or children under 53 
eighteen years of age, of any veteran whose cooperation in the 54 
program is integral to the treatment of the veteran .55 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2019 27-103(a) and (b) 
 
VA Joint Favorable