Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00878 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/17/2019

                     
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00878-R01-
SB.docx  
1 of 1 
 
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 878  
January Session, 2019 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT ENHANCING PUB LIC-PRIVATE PARTNERSHIPS .  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 4-256 of the general statutes is 1 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 2 
1, 2019): 3 
(a) On and after October 27, 2011, and prior to [January 1, 2020] 4 
December 1, 2022, the Governor shall approve not more than [five] 5 
seven projects to be implemented as public-private partnership 6 
projects. The Governor shall not approve any such project unless the 7 
Governor finds that the project will result in job creation and economic 8 
growth. Any agency seeking to establish a public-private partnership 9 
shall, after consultation with the Commissioners of Economic and 10 
Community Development, Administrative Services and 11 
Transportation, the State Treasurer and the Secretary of the Office of 12 
Policy and Management, submit one or more projects to the Governor 13 
for approval. 14 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2019 4-256(a) 
 
GAE Joint Favorable Subst.