Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00935 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/21/2019

                        
 
LCO No. 3875  	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 935  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 3875 
 
 
Referred to Committee on EDUCATION  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(ED)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT REQUIRING THE OFFICE OF EARLY CHILDHOOD TO 
DEVELOP AN EARLY CHI LDHOOD EDUCATOR COMP ENSATION 
SCHEDULE. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2019) (a) As used in this section: 1 
(1) "Early childhood education program" means any program that 2 
accepts state funds for infant, toddler and preschool spaces associated 3 
with such program's child care program or school readiness program; 4 
(2) "Employee" means any person who is employed by an early 5 
childhood education program and meets the applicable staff 6 
qualifications requirement defined in section 10-16p of the general 7 
statutes; 8 
(3) "Compensation" means the salary, wages, benefits and other 9 
forms of valuable consideration earned by and provided to an 10 
employee in remuneration for services rendered; and 11 
(4) "Compensation schedule" means a list or lists specifying a series 12  Raised Bill No.  935 
 
 
 
LCO No. 3875   	2 of 4 
 
of compensation steps and ranges. 13 
(b) The Office of Early Childhood shall establish, after notice and 14 
opportunity for public comment, an early childhood educator 15 
compensation schedule for employees of early childhood education 16 
programs.  17 
(c) (1) The office shall consider the following factors in developing 18 
the early childhood educator compensation schedule: (A) Level of 19 
education, (B) training in early childhood education or child 20 
development, (C) relevant employment experience, including the 21 
number of years an individual has been employed in an early 22 
childhood education program, (D) compensation levels for certified 23 
teachers employed in a preschool program operated by a local or 24 
regional board of education or regional educational service center, and 25 
(E) cost of living in the state. 26 
(2) In developing the early childhood educator compensation 27 
schedule, the office may ( A) consider the findings and 28 
recommendations provided in "A Plan to Assist Early Education State 29 
Funded Providers to Degree Attainment and Increased Compensation" 30 
created by the office, pursuant to section 4 of public act 15-134, to 31 
create a standardized salary scale and incentive package for early 32 
childhood educators, (B) utilize state and federal funding, and (C) 33 
examine existing programs that address early childhood educator 34 
compensation and staff retention through financial incentives, such as 35 
bonuses for degree or course completion. 36 
(3) The office shall establish a minimum salary for employees as 37 
part of the early childhood educator compensation schedule. 38 
(d) Not later than January 1, 2020, the office shall submit an initial 39 
version of the early childhood educator compensation schedule and a 40 
report to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly 41 
having cognizance of matters relating to education and appropriations 42 
and the budgets of state agencies, in accordance with the provisions of 43 
section 11-4a of the general statutes. Such report shall include: (1) Any 44  Raised Bill No.  935 
 
 
 
LCO No. 3875   	3 of 4 
 
recommendations for legislation relating to the implementation of the 45 
proposed early childhood educator compensation schedule, (2) an 46 
estimate of the cost of implementing the early childhood educator 47 
compensation schedule, (3) an analysis of the effect of the 48 
implementation of the early childhood educator compensation 49 
schedule on the number of available preschool seats, and (4) an 50 
explanation of how the early childhood educator compensation 51 
schedule will be included in any quality rating and improvement 52 
system developed by the office, pursuant to subdivision (15) of 53 
subsection (b) of section 10-500 of the general statutes. 54 
(e) For the period of January 1, 2020, to January 1, 2021, inclusive, 55 
the office shall make any revisions or adjustments to the initial version 56 
of the early childhood educator compensation schedule. Not later than 57 
February 1, 2021, the office shall adopt a final version of the early 58 
childhood educator compensation schedule, and submit the 59 
compensation schedule to the joint standing committees of the General 60 
Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to education and 61 
appropriations and the budgets of state agencies, in accordance with 62 
the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes.  63 
(f) On and after July 1, 2021, early childhood education program 64 
providers shall implement the early childhood educator compensation 65 
schedule. The office shall provide technical assistance to early child 66 
education program providers for the implementation of the early 67 
childhood educator compensation schedule.  68 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2019 New section 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To require the Office of Early Childhood to develop an early childhood 
educator compensation schedule and for early childhood program 
providers to implement such compensation schedule.  Raised Bill No.  935 
 
 
 
LCO No. 3875   	4 of 4 
 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, 
except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is 
not underlined.]