Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00969 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/27/2019

                       
 
LCO No. 5064  	1 of 3 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 969  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 5064 
 
 
Referred to Committee on JUDICIARY  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(JUD)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TH E REDUCTION OF ECONOMIC DAMAGES 
IN A PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH AC TION FOR 
COLLATERAL SOURCE PA YMENTS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 52-225a of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2019): 2 
(a) In any civil action, whether in tort or in contract, wherein (1) the 3 
claimant seeks to recover damages resulting from [(1)] personal injury 4 
or wrongful death, [occurring on or after October 1, 1987, or (2) 5 
personal injury or wrongful death, arising out of the rendition of 6 
professional services by a health care provider, occurring on or after 7 
October 1, 1985, and prior to October 1, 1986, if the action was filed on 8 
or after October 1, 1987, and wherein] and (2) liability is admitted or is 9 
determined by the trier of fact and damages are awarded to 10 
compensate the claimant, the court shall reduce the amount of such 11 
award which represents economic damages, as defined in subdivision 12 
(1) of subsection (a) of section 52-572h, by an amount equal to the total 13 
of amounts determined to have been paid under subsection (b) of this 14  Raised Bill No.  969 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5064   	2 of 3 
 
section less the total of amounts determined to have been paid, 15 
contributed or forfeited under subsection (c) of this section, except that 16 
there shall be no reduction for [(A) a collateral source for which a right 17 
of subrogation exists, and (B) the amount] the amount (A) subject to a 18 
right of subrogation, (B) agreed upon in full satisfaction of any right of 19 
subrogation, (C) to which a right of subrogation has not been waived, 20 
limited or extinguished, or (D) of collateral sources equal to the 21 
reduction in the claimant's economic damages attributable to the 22 
claimant's percentage of negligence pursuant to section 52-572h. 23 
(b) Upon a finding of liability and an awarding of damages by the 24 
trier of fact and before the court enters judgment, the court shall 25 
receive evidence from the claimant and other appropriate persons 26 
concerning: [the] (1) The total amount of collateral sources which have 27 
been paid for the benefit of the claimant as of the date the court enters 28 
judgment, (2) the total amounts subject to a right of subrogation, (3) 29 
the total amounts agreed upon in full satisfaction of a right of 30 
subrogation, and (4) the total amount to which a right of subrogation 31 
has not been waived, limited or extinguished. For purposes of this 32 
subsection, evidence that a physician or physician assistant, dentist, 33 
chiropractor, naturopath, physical therapist, podiatrist, psychologist, 34 
social worker, mental health professional, an emergency medical 35 
technician, optometrist, or advanced practice registered nurse, 36 
accepted an amount less than the total amount of any bill generated by 37 
such physician, physician assistant, dentist, chiropractor, naturopath, 38 
physical therapist, podiatrist, psychologist, social worker, mental 39 
health professional, emergency medical technician, optometrist or 40 
advanced practice registered nurse, or evidence that an insurer paid 41 
less than the total amount of any bill generated by such physician, 42 
physician assistant, dentist, chiropractor, naturopath, physical 43 
therapist, podiatrist, psychologist, social worker, mental health 44 
professional, emergency medical technician, optometrist or advanced 45 
practice registered nurse, shall be admissible as evidence of the total 46 
amount of collateral sources which have been paid for the benefit of 47 
the claimant as of the date the court enters judgment. 48  Raised Bill No.  969 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5064   	3 of 3 
 
(c) The court shall receive evidence from the claimant and any other 49 
appropriate person concerning any amount which has been paid, 50 
contributed or forfeited, as of the date the court enters judgment, by, or 51 
on behalf of, the claimant or members of [his] the claimant's immediate 52 
family to secure his or her right to any collateral source benefit which 53 
[he] the claimant has received as a result of such injury or death.  54 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2019 52-225a 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To permit a post-verdict collateral source reduction in damages in 
certain personal injury or wrongful death matters involving a right of 
subrogation. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, 
except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is 
not underlined.]