Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00972 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/27/2019

                        
 
LCO No. 4993  	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 972  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 4993 
 
 
Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(PD)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING AC CESS TO ORIGINAL BIRTH RECOR DS BY 
ADULT ADOPTED PERSON S. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subsection (c) of section 7-53 of the general statutes is 1 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 2 
1, 2019): 3 
(c) Upon request, the department shall issue an uncertified copy of 4 
an original certificate of birth to (1) an adopted person who is eighteen 5 
years of age or older, [whose adoption was finalized on or after 6 
October 1, 1983,] or (2) such adopted person's adult child or 7 
grandchild. Such certificate shall be marked with a notation by the 8 
issuer that such original certificate of birth has been superseded by a 9 
replacement certificate of birth as on file. Additionally, a notice stating 10 
that information related to the birth parents' preferences regarding 11 
contact by such adopted person or such adopted person's adult child 12 
or grandchild and a medical health history form completed by the 13 
birth parent may be on file with the Department of Children and 14 
Families shall be printed on such certificate or attached thereto. 15  Raised Bill No.  972 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4993   	2 of 4 
 
Sec. 2. Section 7-53a of the general statutes is repealed and the 16 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2019): 17 
[(a) Not later than January 1, 2016, and annually thereafter until 18 
January 1, 2021, the Commissioner of Public Health shall submit a 19 
report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a, concerning 20 
the number of original birth certificates issued annually to adopted 21 
persons eighteen years of age or older whose adoption was finalized 22 
on or after October 1, 1983, or the adult children or grandchildren of 23 
adopted persons in accordance with section 7-53, to the joint standing 24 
committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters 25 
relating to public health.] 26 
[(b)] Not later than January 1, [2016] 2020, and annually thereafter 27 
until January 1, [2021] 2025, the Commissioner of Children and 28 
Families shall submit a report, in accordance with the provisions of 29 
section 11-4a, concerning the number of contact preference forms and 30 
medical health history forms annually filed with the department in 31 
accordance with section 17a-60a to the joint standing committee of the 32 
General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public 33 
health. The report shall include the number of birth parents that 34 
selected each option described in section 17a-60a. 35 
Sec. 3. Subsection (c) of section 45a-751b of the general statutes is 36 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 37 
1, 2019): 38 
(c) Regardless of the date parental rights were terminated, on or 39 
after July 1, [2015] 2019, the Department of Public Health shall, upon 40 
request, issue an uncertified copy of an original birth certificate to an 41 
adopted person eighteen years of age or older who is the subject of the 42 
birth certificate, [and whose adoption was finalized on or after October 43 
1, 1983,] or such adopted person's adult child or grandchild, in 44 
accordance with the provisions of section 7-53, as amended by this act. 45 
Sec. 4. Section 45a-751c of the general statutes is repealed and the 46 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2019): 47  Raised Bill No.  972 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4993   	3 of 4 
 
[(a) On the petition of an adopted person who is eighteen years of 48 
age or older and whose adoption was finalized prior to October 1, 49 
1983, or such adopted person's adult child or grandchild, the Probate 50 
Court or the Superior Court that finalized an adoption or appointed a 51 
guardian ad litem in accordance with section 45a-753 shall issue an 52 
order directing the Department of Public Health to issue an uncertified 53 
copy of an original birth certificate to such adopted person or such 54 
adopted person's child or grandchild in accordance with subsection (b) 55 
of section 7-53, provided each birth parent named on the original birth 56 
certificate: (1) Consents to the release of identifying information in 57 
accordance with sections 45a-751 to 45a-751b, inclusive; (2) is deceased; 58 
or (3) a legal representative or guardian ad litem consents to the 59 
release of identifying information on behalf of the birth parent in 60 
accordance with section 45a-753. Nothing in this section shall limit the 61 
right of an adopted person eighteen years of age or older whose 62 
adoption was finalized on or after October 1, 1983, or such adopted 63 
person's adult child or grandchild to obtain an uncertified copy of an 64 
original birth certificate pursuant to section 7-53.] 65 
[(b)] On the petition of an authorized applicant, as defined in section 66 
45a-743, the Probate Court or the Superior Court that finalized an 67 
adoption or appointed a guardian ad litem in accordance with section 68 
45a-753 shall issue an order directing the Department of Public Health 69 
to issue an uncertified copy of an original birth certificate to the 70 
authorized applicant in accordance with subsection (b) of section 7-53, 71 
provided the person named in the certificate of birth is deceased and 72 
(1) each birth parent named on the original birth certificate [: (1) 73 
Consents] (A) consents to the release of identifying information, in 74 
accordance with sections 45a-751 to 45a-751b, inclusive, as amended by 75 
this act, [; (2)] or (B) is deceased, [; or (3)] or (2) a legal representative or 76 
guardian ad litem consents to the release of identifying information on 77 
behalf of the birth parent, in accordance with section 45a-753.  78 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
  Raised Bill No.  972 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4993   	4 of 4 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2019 7-53(c) 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2019 7-53a 
Sec. 3 July 1, 2019 45a-751b(c) 
Sec. 4 July 1, 2019 45a-751c 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To grant access to original birth records to all adopted persons 
eighteen years of age or older who were born in Connecticut 
regardless of date of birth. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, 
except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is 
not underlined.]