Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01012 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/06/2019

                        
 
LCO No. 5540  	1 of 4 
  
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 1012  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 5540 
 
 
Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(PD)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING CE RTAIN MUNICIPAL PROPERTY T AX 
APPEALS AND CONTINGE NCY AGREEMENTS FOR E XPERT 
TESTIMONY IN SUCH APPEALS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 12-117a of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2019): 2 
(a) Any person, including any lessee of real property whose lease 3 
has been recorded as provided in section 47-19 and who is bound 4 
under the terms of his lease to pay real property taxes, claiming to be 5 
aggrieved by the action of the board of tax review or the board of 6 
assessment appeals, as the case may be, in any town or city may, 7 
within two months from the date of the mailing of notice of such 8 
action, make application, in the nature of an appeal therefrom, with 9 
respect to the assessment list for the assessment year commencing 10 
October 1, 1989, October 1, 1990, October 1, 1991, October 1, 1992, 11 
October 1, 1993, October 1, 1994, or October 1, 1995, and with respect 12 
to the assessment list for assessment years thereafter, to the superior 13 
court for the judicial district in which such town or city is situated, 14  Raised Bill No.  1012 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5540   	2 of 4 
 
which shall be accompanied by a citation to such town or city to 15 
appear before said court. Such citation shall be signed by the same 16 
authority and such appeal shall be returnable at the same time and 17 
served and returned in the same manner as is required in case of a 18 
summons in a civil action. The authority issuing the citation shall take 19 
from the applicant a bond or recognizance to such town or city, with 20 
surety, to prosecute the application to effect and to comply with and 21 
conform to the orders and decrees of the court in the premises. Any 22 
such application shall be a preferred case, to be heard, unless good 23 
cause appears to the contrary, at the first session, by the court or by a 24 
committee appointed by the court. The pendency of such application 25 
shall not suspend an action by such town or city to collect not more 26 
than seventy-five per cent of the tax so assessed or not more than 27 
ninety per cent of such tax with respect to any real property for which 28 
the assessed value is five hundred thousand dollars or more, and upon 29 
which such appeal is taken. If, during the pendency of such appeal, a 30 
new assessment year begins, the applicant may amend his application 31 
as to any matter therein, including an appeal for such new year, which 32 
is affected by the inception of such new year and such applicant need 33 
not appear before the board of tax review or board of assessment 34 
appeals, as the case may be, to make such amendment effective. The 35 
court shall have power to grant such relief as to justice and equity 36 
appertains, upon such terms and in such manner and form as appear 37 
equitable, and, if the application appears to have been made without 38 
probable cause, may tax double or triple costs, as the case appears to 39 
demand; and, upon all such applications, costs may be taxed at the 40 
discretion of the court. If the assessment made by the board of tax 41 
review or board of assessment appeals, as the case may be, is reduced 42 
by said court, the applicant shall be reimbursed by the town or city for 43 
any overpayment of taxes, together with interest and any costs 44 
awarded by the court, or, at the applicant's option, shall be granted a 45 
tax credit for such overpayment, interest and any costs awarded by the 46 
court. Upon motion, said court shall, in event of such overpayment, 47 
enter judgment in favor of such applicant and against such city or 48 
town for the whole amount of such overpayment, less any lien 49  Raised Bill No.  1012 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5540   	3 of 4 
 
recording fees incurred under sections 7-34a and 12-176, together with 50 
interest and any costs awarded by the court. The amount to which the 51 
assessment is so reduced shall be the assessed value of such property 52 
on the grand lists for succeeding years until the tax assessor finds that 53 
the value of the applicant's property has increased or decreased.  54 
(b) In an appeal brought pursuant to this section, no witness, except 55 
a certified public accountant, shall offer expert testimony concerning 56 
the value of the applicant's property if such witness is compensated on 57 
a contingency basis for such testimony. 58 
Sec. 2. Section 12-119 of the general statutes is repealed and the 59 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2019): 60 
(a) When it is claimed that a tax has been laid on property not 61 
taxable in the town or city in whose tax list such property was set, or 62 
that a tax laid on property was computed on an assessment which, 63 
under all the circumstances, was manifestly excessive and could not 64 
have been arrived at except by disregarding the provisions of the 65 
statutes for determining the valuation of such property, the owner 66 
thereof or any lessee thereof whose lease has been recorded as 67 
provided in section 47-19 and who is bound under the terms of his 68 
lease to pay real property taxes, prior to the payment of such tax, may, 69 
in addition to the other remedies provided by law, make application 70 
for relief to the superior court for the judicial district in which such 71 
town or city is situated. Such application may be made within one year 72 
from the date as of which the property was last evaluated for purposes 73 
of taxation and shall be served and returned in the same manner as is 74 
required in the case of a summons in a civil action, and the pendency 75 
of such application shall not suspend action upon the tax against the 76 
applicant. In all such actions, the Superior Court shall have power to 77 
grant such relief upon such terms and in such manner and form as to 78 
justice and equity appertains, and costs may be taxed at the discretion 79 
of the court. If such assessment is reduced by said court, the applicant 80 
shall be reimbursed by the town or city for any overpayment of taxes 81 
in accordance with the judgment of said court.  82  Raised Bill No.  1012 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5540   	4 of 4 
 
(b) In an application for relief made pursuant to this section, no 83 
witness, except a certified public accountant, shall offer expert 84 
testimony concerning the value of the applicant's property if such 85 
witness is compensated on a contingency basis for such testimony. 86 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2019 12-117a 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2019 12-119 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To prohibit an expert witness other than a certified public accountant 
from offering testimony concerning the value of real property in a 
property tax assessment appeal if such witness is compensated on a 
contingency basis for such testimony. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, 
except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is 
not underlined.]