Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01071 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/12/2019

                        
 
LCO No. 5936  	1 of 3 
  
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 1071  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 5936 
 
 
Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(PD)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING AG ING IN PLACE INCENTIVES. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective October 1, 2019) (a) As used in this 1 
section: 2 
(1) "Qualified individual" means an individual with a household 3 
income of not more than one hundred fifty thousand dollars for the 4 
taxable year commencing on or after January 1, 2020; 5 
(2) "Retrofit" means to make changes to a residence that (A) are 6 
necessary to ensure the health, welfare and safety of a qualified 7 
individual, (B) increase the visitability of such residence, (C) enable 8 
greater accessibility and independence for such qualified individual in 9 
such residence, (D) are required due to an illness, impairment or 10 
disability of such qualified individual, and (E) allow such qualified 11 
individual to age in place; and 12 
(3) "Visitability" means a residence's ease of access for persons with 13 
disabilities. 14  Raised Bill No.  1071 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5936   	2 of 3 
 
(b) (1) Except as provided in subdivision (3) of this subsection, for 15 
taxable years commencing on or after January 1, 2020, but prior to 16 
January 1, 2025, there shall be a credit allowed against the tax imposed 17 
under chapter 229 of the general statutes for any qualified individual 18 
who retrofits, or employs a person or business to retrofit, such 19 
qualified individual's residence and who owns such residence. The 20 
credit shall be in an amount equal to the costs of retrofitting such 21 
residence or five thousand dollars, whichever is less. Such qualified 22 
individual shall claim the credit in the taxable year in which such 23 
retrofitting occurred by including the certificate issued pursuant to 24 
subdivision (2) of this subsection with such qualified individual's 25 
income tax return filed with the Commissioner of Revenue Services. 26 
(2) The Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management shall issue 27 
a certificate to any qualified individuals who retrofits a residence in 28 
accordance with subdivision (1) of this subsection, upon the request of 29 
such qualified individual. Such certificate shall identify the taxpayer 30 
and certify that such qualified individual satisfies the requirements of 31 
said subdivision. The secretary shall issue such certificates in the order 32 
in which they are requested. 33 
(3) The Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management shall track 34 
each certificate issued pursuant to subdivision (2) of this subsection in 35 
each taxable year and, upon the total amount of such certificates issued 36 
equaling one million dollars in such taxable year, shall not issue any 37 
further such certificate in such taxable year. 38 
(c) The amount of the credit allowed to any qualified individual 39 
pursuant to this section shall not exceed the amount of tax due from 40 
such qualified individual under chapter 229 of the general statutes 41 
with respect to the taxable year in which such credit is being claimed. 42 
Any such credit claimed by such qualified individual but not applied 43 
against the tax due under said chapter may be carried forward for the 44 
five immediately succeeding taxable years until the full credit has been 45 
applied. 46  Raised Bill No.  1071 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5936   	3 of 3 
 
(d) Not later than January 1, 2021, and annually thereafter until 47 
January 1, 2024, the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management 48 
shall submit to the Commissioner of Revenue Services a report of each 49 
taxpayer to whom the secretary has issued a certificate pursuant to 50 
subdivision (2) of subsection (c) of this act for the prior taxable year, 51 
which report shall include (1) the name of each such taxpayer, (2) the 52 
Social Security number or federal employee identification number, and 53 
(3) the amount of the tax credit allocated. 54 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2019 New section 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To provide a state income tax credit to taxpayers who incur costs 
retrofitting a residence for purposes of allowing an individual to age in 
place. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, 
except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is 
not underlined.]