Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01082 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/17/2019

                     
 
LCO 5986  \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-01082-R01-
SB.docx  
1 of 4 
  
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 1082  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 5986 
 
 
Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND 
DEVELOPMENT  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(PD)  
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TH E CONSOLIDATION OF PUBLIC SAFETY 
ANSWERING POINTS.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 28-24 of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2019): 2 
(a) There is established a Division of State-Wide Emergency 3 
Telecommunications which shall be within the Department of 4 
Emergency Services and Public Protection. The Division of State-Wide 5 
Emergency Telecommunications shall be responsible for developing 6 
and maintaining a state-wide emergency service telecommunications 7 
policy. In connection with said policy, the division shall: 8 
(1) Develop a state-wide emergency service telecommunications 9 
plan specifying emergency police, fire and medical service 10 
telecommunications systems needed to provide coordinated 11 
emergency service telecommunications to all state residents, including 12 
the physically disabled; 13  Raised Bill No. 1082 
 
 
LCO 5986  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-01082-
R01-SB.docx }   
2 of 4 
 
(2) Develop and administer an enhanced emergency 9-1-1 program, 14 
which shall provide for: (A) The replacement of existing 9-1-1 terminal 15 
equipment for each public safety answering point; (B) the 16 
subsidization of regional public safety emergency telecommunications 17 
centers, with enhanced subsidization for municipalities with a 18 
population of forty thousand or more; (C) the establishment of [a 19 
transition grant program] incentives to encourage regionalization of 20 
public safety answering points, which incentives shall include, but not 21 
be limited to, a transition grant program; (D) the establishment of a 22 
regional emergency telecommunications service credit in order to 23 
support regional dispatch services; and (E) the implementation of the 24 
next generation 9-1-1 telecommunication system; 25 
(3) Provide technical telecommunications assistance to state and 26 
local police, fire and emergency medical service agencies; 27 
(4) Provide frequency coordination for such agencies; 28 
(5) Coordinate and assist in state-wide planning for 9-1-1, E 9-1-1 29 
and the next generation 9-1-1 telecommunication systems, with a focus 30 
on facilitating the regionalization of public safety answering points; 31 
(6) Review and make recommendations concerning proposed 32 
legislation affecting emergency service telecommunications;  33 
(7) Review and make recommendations to the General Assembly 34 
concerning emergency service telecommunications funding, including 35 
ways to reduce costs by removing barriers to consolidation of existing 36 
public safety answering points; and 37 
(8) On or before January first of each year, prepare the annual 38 
budget for the use of funds from th e Enhanced 9-1-1 39 
Telecommunications Fund and submit such budget to the Secretary of 40 
the Office of Policy and Management for the secretary's review and 41 
approval. On or before January fifteenth of each year, said secretary 42 
shall submit a report concerning the proposed use of such funds to the 43 
joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance 44  Raised Bill No. 1082 
 
 
LCO 5986  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-01082-
R01-SB.docx }   
3 of 4 
 
of matters relating to appropriations and the budgets of state agencies, 45 
finance, revenue and bonding, and public safety in accordance with 46 
the provisions of section 11-4a. 47 
(b) The Commissioner of Emergency Services and Public Protection 48 
shall adopt regulations, in accordance with chapter 54, establishing 49 
eligibility standards for state financial assistance to local or regional 50 
police, fire and emergency medical service agencies providing 51 
emergency service telecommunications. Not later than April 1, 1997, 52 
the commissioner shall adopt regulations, in accordance with chapter 53 
54, in order to carry out the provisions of subdivision (2) of subsection 54 
(a) of this section. 55 
(c) Within a time period determined by the commissioner to ensure 56 
the availability of funds for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 1997, to the 57 
regional emergency telecommunications centers within the state, and 58 
not later than April first of each year thereafter, the commissioner shall 59 
determine the amount of funding needed for the development and 60 
administration of the enhanced emergency 9-1-1 program. The 61 
commissioner shall specify the expenses associated with (1) the 62 
purchase, installation and maintenance of new public safety answering 63 
point terminal equipment, (2) the implementation of the subsidy 64 
program, as described in subdivision (2) of subsection (a) of this 65 
section, (3) the establishment of incentives to encourage 66 
regionalization of public safety answering points, including the 67 
implementation of the transition grant program, described in 68 
subdivision (2) of subsection (a) of this section, (4) the implementation 69 
of the regional emergency telecommunications service credit, as 70 
described in subdivision (2) of subsection (a) of this section, provided, 71 
for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2001, and each fiscal year thereafter, 72 
such credit for coordinated medical emergency direction services as 73 
provided in regulations adopted under this section shall be based 74 
upon the factor of thirty cents per capita and shall not be reduced each 75 
year, (5) the training of personnel, as necessary, (6) recurring expenses 76 
and future capital costs associated with the telecommunications 77  Raised Bill No. 1082 
 
 
LCO 5986  {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-01082-
R01-SB.docx }   
4 of 4 
 
network used to provide emergency 9-1-1 service and the public safety 78 
services data networks, (7) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2001, and 79 
each fiscal year thereafter, the collection, maintenance and reporting of 80 
emergency medical services data, as required under subparagraph (A) 81 
of subdivision (8) of section 19a-177, provided the amount of expenses 82 
specified under this subdivision shall not exceed two hundred fifty 83 
thousand dollars in any fiscal year, (8) for the fiscal year ending June 84 
30, 2001, and each fiscal year thereafter, the initial training of 85 
emergency medical dispatch personnel, the provision of an emergency 86 
medical dispatch priority reference card set and emergency medical 87 
dispatch training and continuing education pursuant to subdivisions 88 
(3) and (4) of subsection (g) of section 28-25b, (9) the administration of 89 
the enhanced emergency 9-1-1 program by the Division of State-Wide 90 
Emergency Telecommunications, as the commissioner determines to 91 
be reasonably necessary, and (10) the implementation and 92 
maintenance of the public safety data network established pursuant to 93 
section 29-1j. The commissioner shall communicate the commissioner's 94 
findings to the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority not later than 95 
April first of each year. 96 
(d) The division may apply for, receive and distribute any federal 97 
funds available for emergency service telecommunications. The 98 
division shall deposit such federal funds in the Enhanced 9-1-1 99 
Telecommunications Fund established pursuant to section 28-30a. 100 
(e) The division shall work in cooperation with the Public Utilities 101 
Regulatory Authority to carry out the purposes of this section.  102 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2019 28-24 
 
PD Joint Favorable