Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01207 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 07/25/2019

                     
 
 
Senate Bill No. 1207 
 
July Special Session, Special Act No. 19-7 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TH E CONVEYANCE OF CERT AIN 
PARCELS OF STATE LAN D IN THE BOROUGH OF NAUGATUCK. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (Effective from passage) (a) Notwithstanding any provision 
of the general statutes, the Commissioner of Transportation shall 
convey to the borough of Naugatuck two parcels of land located in the 
borough of Naugatuck at a cost equal to the fair market value of the 
properties, as determined by the average of the appraisals of two 
independent appraisers selected by the commissioner, plus the 
administrative costs of making such conveyance. The first parcel of 
land has an area of approximately 2.888 acres and is identified as 
"Lease Area = 2.888± Acres" on a map entitled "Town of Naugatuck, 
Sketch Showing Land Leased to SWR, LLC by the State of Connecticut, 
Valuation Map 57-71-22, scale 1" - 100', June 1988, Bureau of Public 
Transportation - Office of Rail Operations", drawn on June 27, 1988, 
and last revised on December 16, 2003. The second parcel of land has 
an area of approximately .654 acre and is identified as "Lease Area = 
0.654± Acre" on a map entitled "Town of Naugatuck, Sketch Showing 
Land Leased to Lineweber Bros. L.L.C. by the State of Connecticut, 
Valuation Map 57-71-22, scale 1" - 100', January 1998, Bureau of Public 
Transportation - Office of Rail Operations", drawn on January 9, 1998. 
The precise size and location of said parcels to be conveyed, as well as  Senate Bill No. 1207 
 
July Sp. Sess., Special Act No. 19-7 	2 of 2 
 
any easement to be reserved in favor of the state, shall be determined 
by the commissioner. The conveyance shall be subject to the approval 
of the State Properties Review Board. 
(b) The State Properties Review Board shall complete its review of 
the conveyance of said parcels of land not later than thirty days after it 
receives a proposed agreement from the Department of 
Transportation. The land shall remain under the care and control of 
said department until a conveyance is made in accordance with the 
provisions of this section. The State Treasurer shall execute and deliver 
any deed or instrument necessary for a conveyance under this section. 
The Commissioner of Transportation shall have the sole responsibility 
for all other incidents of such conveyance. 
Approved July 23, 2019