LCO 5407 \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-05377-R02- HB.docx 1 of 3 General Assembly Committee Bill No. 5377 January Session, 2021 LCO No. 5407 Referred to Committee on LABOR AND PUBLIC EMPLOYEES Introduced by: (LAB) AN ACT CONCERNING TH E REMOVAL OF COVID-19 RELATED LAYOFFS FROM THE UNE MPLOYMENT COMPENSATI ON EXPERIENCE ACCOUNT. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 31-225a of the general statutes is 1 repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 2 1, 2021): 3 (a) As used in this chapter: [, "qualified employer"] 4 (1) "Qualified employer" means each employer subject to this chapter 5 whose experience record has been chargeable with benefits for at least 6 one full experience year, with the exception of employers subject to a 7 flat entry rate of contributions as provided under subsection (d) of this 8 section, employers subject to the maximum contribution rate under 9 subsection (c) of section 31-273, and reimbursing employers; 10 ["contributing employer"] 11 (2) "Contributing employer" means an employer who is assigned a 12 percentage rate of contribution under the provisions of this section; 13 Committee Bill No. 5377 LCO 5407 {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-05377- R02-HB.docx } 2 of 3 ["reimbursing employer"] 14 (3) "Reimbursing employer" means an employer liable for payments 15 in lieu of contributions as provided under section 31-225; ["benefit 16 charges"] 17 (4) "Benefit charges" means the amount of benefit payments charged 18 to an employer's experience account under this section; ["computation 19 date"] 20 (5) "Computation date" means June thirtieth of the year preceding the 21 tax year for which the contribution rates are computed; ["tax year"] 22 (6) "Tax year" means the calendar year immediately following the 23 computation date; ["experience year"] 24 (7) "Experience year" means the twelve consecutive months ending 25 on June thirtieth; [and "experience period"] 26 (8) "Experience period" means the three consecutive experience years 27 ending on the computation date, except that (A) if the employer's 28 account has been chargeable with benefits for less than three years, the 29 experience period shall consist of the greater of one or two consecutive 30 experience years ending on the computation date, and (B) to the extent 31 allowed by federal law and as necessary to respond to the spread of 32 COVID-19, for any taxable year commencing on or after January 1, 2022, 33 the experience period shall be calculated without regard to benefit 34 charges and taxable wages for the experience years ending June 30, 2020, 35 and June 30, 2021, when applicable; and 36 (9) "COVID-19" means the respiratory disease designated by the 37 World Health Organization on February 11, 2020, as coronavirus 2019, 38 and any related mutation thereof recognized by the World Health 39 Organization as a communicable respiratory disease. 40 Sec. 2. Subsection (d) of section 31-225a of the general statutes is 41 repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 42 Committee Bill No. 5377 LCO 5407 {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-05377- R02-HB.docx } 3 of 3 1, 2021): 43 (d) The standard rate of contributions shall be five and four-tenths 44 per cent. Each employer who has not been chargeable with benefits, for 45 a sufficient period of time to have his or her rate computed under this 46 section shall pay contributions at a rate that is the higher of (1) one per 47 cent, or (2) the state's five-year benefit cost rate. For purposes of this 48 subsection, the state's five-year benefit cost rate shall be computed 49 annually on or before June thirtieth and shall be derived by dividing the 50 total dollar amount of benefits paid to claimants under this chapter 51 during the five consecutive calendar years immediately preceding the 52 computation date by the five-year payroll during the same period, 53 except that, to the extent allowed by federal law and as necessary to 54 respond to the spread of COVID-19, for any taxable year commencing 55 on or after January 1, 2022, the state's five-year benefit cost rate shall be 56 calculated without regard to benefit payments and taxable wages for 57 calendar years 2020 and 2021, when applicable. If the resulting quotient 58 is not an exact multiple of one-tenth of one per cent, the five-year benefit 59 cost rate shall be the next higher such multiple. 60 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Section 1 October 1, 2021 31-225a(a) Sec. 2 October 1, 2021 31-225a(d) LAB Joint Favorable