Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05377 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 05/05/2021

                     
 
 
House Bill No. 5377 
 
Public Act No. 21-5 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TH E REMOVAL OF COVID -19 RELATED 
LAYOFFS FROM THE UNE MPLOYMENT COMPENSATI ON 
EXPERIENCE ACCOUNT. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 31-225a of the general statutes is 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 
1, 2021): 
(a) As used in this chapter: [, "qualified employer"] 
(1) "Qualified employer" means each employer subject to this chapter 
whose experience record has been chargeable with benefits for at least 
one full experience year, with the exception of employers subject to a 
flat entry rate of contributions as provided under subsection (d) of this 
section, employers subject to the maximum contribution rate under 
subsection (c) of section 31-273, and reimbursing employers; 
["contributing employer"] 
(2) "Contributing employer" means an employer who is assigned a 
percentage rate of contribution under the provisions of this section; 
["reimbursing employer"] 
(3) "Reimbursing employer" means an employer liable for payments  House Bill No. 5377 
 
Public Act No. 21-5 	2 of 3 
 
in lieu of contributions as provided under section 31-225; ["benefit 
charges"] 
(4) "Benefit charges" means the amount of benefit payments charged 
to an employer's experience account under this section; ["computation 
date"] 
(5) "Computation date" means June thirtieth of the year preceding the 
tax year for which the contribution rates are computed; ["tax year"] 
(6) "Tax year" means the calendar year immediately following the 
computation date; ["experience year"] 
(7) "Experience year" means the twelve consecutive months ending 
on June thirtieth; [and "experience period"] 
(8) "Experience period" means the three consecutive experience years 
ending on the computation date, except that (A) if the employer's 
account has been chargeable with benefits for less than three years, the 
experience period shall consist of the greater of one or two consecutive 
experience years ending on the computation date, [.] and (B) to the 
extent allowed by federal law and as necessary to respond to the spread 
of COVID-19, for any taxable year commencing on or after January 1, 
2022, the experience period shall be calculated without regard to benefit 
charges and taxable wages for the experience years ending June 30, 2020, 
and June 30, 2021, when applicable; and 
(9) "COVID-19" means the respiratory disease designated by the 
World Health Organization on February 11, 2020, as coronavirus 2019, 
and any related mutation thereof recognized by the World Health 
Organization as a communicable respiratory disease. 
Sec. 2. Subsection (d) of section 31-225a of the general statutes is 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 
1, 2021):  House Bill No. 5377 
 
Public Act No. 21-5 	3 of 3 
 
(d) The standard rate of contributions shall be five and four-tenths 
per cent. Each employer who has not been chargeable with benefits, for 
a sufficient period of time to have his or her rate computed under this 
section shall pay contributions at a rate that is the higher of (1) one per 
cent, or (2) the state's five-year benefit cost rate. For purposes of this 
subsection, the state's five-year benefit cost rate shall be computed 
annually on or before June thirtieth and shall be derived by dividing the 
total dollar amount of benefits paid to claimants under this chapter 
during the five consecutive calendar years immediately preceding the 
computation date by the five-year payroll during the same period, 
except that, to the extent allowed by federal law and as necessary to 
respond to the spread of COVID-19, for any taxable year commencing 
on or after January 1, 2022, the state's five-year benefit cost rate shall be 
calculated without regard to benefit payments and taxable wages for 
calendar years 2020 and 2021, when applicable. If the resulting quotient 
is not an exact multiple of one-tenth of one per cent, the five-year benefit 
cost rate shall be the next higher such multiple. 
Approved May 3, 2021