Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05377 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/06/2021

                     
Researcher: LRH 	Page 1 	4/6/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 5377  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE REMOVAL OF COVID -19 RELATED 
LAYOFFS FROM THE UNEMPLOYMENT COMPENSATION 
EXPERIENCE ACCOUNT.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill disregards an employer’s benefit charges and taxable 
wages between July 1, 2019, and June 30, 2021, when calculating the 
employer’s unemployment tax experience rate for taxable years 
starting on or after January 1, 2022. In effect, this means that the 
unemployment benefits paid to an employer’s former employees 
during that period will not affect the employer’s experience rate. The 
bill's provisions apply to the extent allowed by federal law and as 
necessary to respond to the spread of COVID-19. 
The bill similarly disregards the statewide benefits and taxable 
wages for calendar years 2020 and 2021 when calculating the 
unemployment tax rate that will apply to new employers for tax years 
starting on or after January 1, 2022 (see BACKGROUND). Thus, the 
rate charged to employers who have not participated in the system 
long enough to have their own experience rates will not be affected by 
the benefits paid during those years.    
EFFECTIVE DATE:  October 1, 2021 
EXPERIENCE RATES 
By law, an employer’s experience rate generally depends on the 
amount of unemployment benefits its former employees received 
during its “experience period,” which is the three-year period 
preceding each June 30, when an employer’s rate is calculated. Under 
current law, an employer’s rate is determined by calculating the ratio 
between the amount charged to the employer’s experience account 
(generally, the amount of benefits paid to its former employees) and  2021HB-05377-R000254-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: LRH 	Page 2 	4/6/21 
 
the amount of the employer’s taxable wages during the experience 
period. This ratio is converted to a percentage between 0.5% and 5.4%, 
which becomes the employer’s experience rate (CGS § 31-225a(e)). 
For tax years starting on or after January 1, 2022, the bill requires 
that an employer’s experience period disregard the employer’s benefit 
charges and taxable wages from July 1, 2019, through June 30, 2021, 
when applicable. Thus, an employer’s experience rate would not be 
affected by the chargeable benefits paid to its employees during that 
period.  
NEW EMPLOYER RATES 
By law, employers that have not been chargeable with benefits for a 
long enough time to have their own experience rate calculated must 
pay 1% or the state's five-year benefit cost rate, whichever is higher. 
Under current law, the state's five-year benefit cost rate is determined 
by dividing the total benefits paid to claimants over the previous five 
years by the five-year payroll over that period. 
For tax years starting on or after January 1, 2022, the bill requires 
that the five-year benefit cost rate be calculated without the benefit 
payments and taxable wages for calendar years 2020 and 2021, when 
applicable. Thus, the statewide benefits paid during those years will 
not affect the rate charged to the new employers.  
BACKGROUND 
Unemployment Tax Rate 
By law employers pay state unemployment insurance (UI) taxes to 
support the state’s Unemployment Trust Fund, which provides UI 
benefits to eligible claimants. An employer’s state UI tax liability 
typically depends on three factors: (1) its experience rate, (2) the fund 
balance rate (a tax rate tied to the financial solvency of the state’s 
unemployment trust fund), and (3) its taxable wage base (the amount 
of wages it paid that are subject to state UI taxes). Generally, the sum 
of the first two rates, which can range from 0.5% to 6.8%, applies 
against the first $15,000 of each employee’s wages (the taxable wage 
base) (CGS § 31-225a).  2021HB-05377-R000254-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: LRH 	Page 3 	4/6/21 
 
Related Bills 
sSB 1002 (§§ 26-27) and sHB 6595 (§§ 26-27), reported favorably by 
the Labor and Public Employees Committee, both contain identical 
provisions as this bill.    
SB 711, reported favorably by the Commerce Committee, creates a 
“non-charge” against an employer’s experience rate for the 
unemployment benefits paid to former employees because of COVID-
19. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Labor and Public Employees Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 13 Nay 0 (03/18/2021)