Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05377 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 08/10/2021

                    O F F I C E O F L E G I S L A T I V E R E S E A R C H 
P U B L I C A C T S U M M A R Y 
 
  	Page 1 
PA 21-5—HB 5377 
Labor and Public Employees Committee 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TH E REMOVAL OF COVID -19 RELATED 
LAYOFFS FROM THE UNE MPLOYMENT COMPENSATI ON 
EXPERIENCE ACCOUNT 
 
SUMMARY: This act disregards an employer’s benefit charges and taxable 
wages between July 1, 2019, and June 30, 2021, when calculating the employer’s 
unemployment tax experience rate for taxable years starting on or after January 1, 
2022 (see BACKGROUND). In effect, this means that the unemployment benefits 
paid to an employer’s former employees during that period will not affect the 
employer’s experience rate. The act’s provisions apply to the extent allowed by 
federal law and as necessary to respond to the spread of COVID-19. 
The act similarly disregards the statewide benefits and taxable wages for 
calendar years 2020 and 2021 when calculating the unemployment tax rate that 
will apply to new employers for tax years starting on or after January 1, 2022. 
Thus, the rate charged to employers who have not participated in the system long 
enough to have their own experience rates will not be affected by the benefits paid 
during those years.    
EFFECTIVE DATE:  October 1, 2021 
 
EXPERIENCE RATES 
 
By law, an employer’s experience rate generally depends on the amount of 
unemployment benefits its former employees received during its “experience 
period,” which is the three-year period preceding each June 30, when an 
employer’s rate is calculated. The rate is determined by calculating the ratio 
between the amount charged to the employer’s experience account (generally, the 
amount of benefits paid to its former employees) and the amount of the 
employer’s taxable wages during the experience period. This ratio is converted to 
a percentage between 0.5% and 5.4%, which becomes the employer’s experience 
rate (CGS § 31-225a(e)). 
But for tax years starting on or after January 1, 2022, the act requires that an 
employer’s experience period disregard the employer’s benefit charges and 
taxable wages from July 1, 2019, through June 30, 2021, when applicable. Thus, 
an employer’s experience rate would not be affected by the chargeable benefits 
paid to its employees during that period.  
 
NEW EMPLOYER RATES 
 
By law, employers that have not been chargeable with benefits for a long 
enough time to have their own experience rate calculated must pay either 1% or  O L R P U B L I C A C T S U M M A R Y 
 	Page 2 of 2  
the state’s five-year benefit cost rate, whichever is higher. The state’s five-year 
benefit cost rate is determined by dividing the total benefits paid to claimants over 
the previous five years by the five-year payroll over that period. 
For tax years starting on or after January 1, 2022, however, the act requires 
that the five-year benefit cost rate be calculated without the benefit payments and 
taxable wages for calendar years 2020 and 2021, when applicable. Thus, the 
statewide benefits paid during those years will not affect the rate charged to the 
new employers.  
 
BACKGROUND 
 
State Unemployment Tax 
 
By law, an employer’s state unemployment tax liability typically depends on 
three factors: (1) its individual experience rate, (2) the statewide fund balance rate 
(a tax rate tied to the trust fund’s financial solvency), and (3) the amount of wages 
it paid that are subject to the tax (the taxable wage base). Generally, the sum of 
the first two rates applies against the taxable wage base (CGS § 31-225a).