Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05597 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 06/04/2021

                     
Researcher: ND 	Page 1 	6/4/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 5597 (as amended by House "A")*  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING OPIOIDS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Department of Mental Health and Addiction 
Services (DMHAS) to establish a pilot program in up to five urban, 
suburban, and rural communities to serve individuals with opioid use 
disorder. The department must do this by January 1, 2022, and within 
available appropriations.  
Under the bill, each participating community must form a team of at 
least two peer navigators who must, among other things, (1) travel 
throughout the community to address the health care and social needs 
of individuals with opioid use disorder and (2) complete regularly 
updated training on non-coercive and non-stigmatizing methods for 
engaging these individuals, as determined by the DMHAS 
commissioner. 
The bill also requires the DMHAS commissioner to report by 
January 1, 2023, to the Public Health Committee on the pilot program, 
including its success and any recommendations for its continuation or 
expansion. 
Additionally, the bill requires the Department of Public Health 
commissioner, by January 1, 2022, to (1) establish guidelines for the use 
of evidence-based, nonpharmaceutical therapies to treat chronic pain, 
including chiropractic treatment and physical therapy, and (2) conduct 
educational and outreach activities to raise awareness about these 
guidelines. 
*House Amendment “A” replaces the underlying bill, (1) removing 
the provision establishing a task force to study protocols used by 
certain health care professionals following opioid overdose deaths and  2021HB-05597-R010785-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 2 	6/4/21 
 
(2) adding the pilot program provisions.  
EFFECTIVE DATE:  July 1, 2021 
PEER NAVIGATORS 
The bill requires each community participating in the pilot program 
to form a team of at least two peer navigators to work to: 
1. increase engagement between individuals with opioid use 
disorder and providers of treatment, healthcare and social 
services; 
2. improve the retention of these individuals in opioid use 
treatment by addressing their social determinants of health and 
emerging local conditions that affect these determinants; and 
3. increase the community’s capacity to support these individuals 
by identifying and addressing systemic barriers to treatment, 
health care, and social services and social support. 
The bill requires the team of peer navigators to (1) travel throughout 
the community to address in-person the health care and social needs of 
individuals with opioid use disorder and (2) be accessible to these 
individuals through a phone number with texting capabilities and 
social media.  
Under the bill, a “peer navigator” is a person with experience 
working with individuals with substance use disorder who (1) 
provides nonmedical mental health care and substance use services 
and (2) has a collaborative relationship with health care professionals 
authorized to prescribe medications to treat opioid use disorder.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Public Health Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 33 Nay 0 (03/29/2021)