Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05601 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/26/2021

                     
 
LCO No. 987   	1 of 2 
 
General Assembly  Proposed Bill No. 5601  
January Session, 2021  
LCO No. 987 
 
 
Referred to Committee on APPROPRIATIONS  
 
 
Introduced by:  
REP. GILCHREST, 18th Dist. 
 
 
 
AN ACT INCREASING FUNDING FOR COMMUNITY NONPROFIT 
PROVIDERS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
That a total of sixty-seven million dollars be appropriated to the 1 
Department of Social Services, the Department of Developmental 2 
Services and the Department of Mental Health and Addiction Services, 3 
from the General Fund, for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, and a 4 
total of fifty-one million dollars be appropriated to said departments, 5 
from the General Fund, for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, and that 6 
the general statutes be amended to require appropriations to said 7 
departments from the General Fund in the amount of fifty-four million 8 
dollars for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024, thirty-four million 9 
dollars for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025, and thirty-five million 10 
dollars for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2026, with all said 11 
appropriations being for the purpose of increasing funding for 12 
nonprofit providers of health and human services. 13  Proposed Bill No.  5601 
 
 
LCO No. 987   	2 of 2 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To increase funding for certain health and human services nonprofit 
providers over the next five fiscal years and leverage significant federal 
matching funds over that period.