Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05614 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/28/2021

                     
Researcher: SM 	Page 1 	4/28/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 5614 (as amended by House "A")*   
 
AN ACT ESTABLISHING A COMMISSION ON THE DISPARATE 
IMPACT OF COVID-19.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill establishes a 22-member Commission on the Disparate 
Impact of COVID-19 within the legislative department. The 
commission must, among other things, analyze and identify the cause 
of any disparate impact of COVID-19 and the federal and state 
responses to it on different racial, ethnic, gender, and socioeconomic 
groups.  
The bill establishes qualifications for commission members and 
requires the commission to hold its first meeting by September 1, 2021. 
The commission's powers and duties include, among other things, 
convening at least two working groups and holding any necessary 
public hearings. The Commission on Women, Children, Seniors, 
Equity, and Opportunity‘s (CWCSEO) administrative staff serve as the 
commission’s administrative staff.  
Starting by January 1, 2022, the commission must annually report its 
findings and legislative and policy recommendations to the 
commission’s appointing authorities and the governor. The 
commission expires on June 20, 2023, or after a two-thirds vote by its 
membership, whichever is earlier.  
*House Amendment "A" (1) changes the bill’s effective date from 
upon passage to July 1, 2021; (2) terminates the commission within a 
specified time period and correspondingly removes provisions on the 
length of members’ terms; (3) eliminates the governor’s appointments 
to the commission; (4) adds gender as a component of the 
commission’s disparate impact analysis and requires the commission 
to assess the effects of the federal response on any COVID-19-related  2021HB-05614-R010621-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 2 	4/28/21 
 
disparate impact; and (5) makes minor and technical changes.   
EFFECTIVE DATE:  July 1, 2021  
COMMISSION POWERS AN D DUTIES 
Under the bill, the commission's powers and duties include:  
1. analyzing any disparate impact of the COVID-19 pandemic on 
the state’s different racial, ethnic, gender, and socioeconomic 
groups and identifying its causes; 
2. assessing the effects of the federal and state responses on any 
such disparate impact;  
3. appointing and convening at least two working groups to 
analyze the impact of COVID-19, one each on (a) education, 
housing, and human services needs and (b) labor, commerce, 
and public health needs;  
4. holding any necessary public hearings;  
5. requesting any necessary and reasonable assistance and data 
available from executive departments, boards, commissions, or 
other state agencies;  
6. accepting gifts, donations, or bequests to perform its duties;  
7. establishing bylaws; and 
8. performing any other necessary and appropriate acts to carry 
out its duties.  
COMMISSION MEMBERSHI P 
The bill establishes the commission with 21 appointed members 
plus the CWCSEO executive director, or his designee, who serves as an 
ex-officio nonvoting member. Appointed members may be legislators.  
Table 1 shows the appointing authority and required qualifications 
for the commission’s 21 voting members.  2021HB-05614-R010621-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 3 	4/28/21 
 
Table 1: Appointed Members 
Appointing Authority Number of 
Appointments 
Qualifications 
House speaker Four Must have expertise in evaluating 
disparities in education, housing, and 
human services  
Senate president pro 
tempore 
Four Must have expertise in evaluating the 
impact of COVID-19 on essential 
workers 
House majority leader Three  Two must have expertise in public 
health and infectious diseases; one 
must be a teacher  
Senate majority leader Three Two must have expertise in small 
business; one must be a housing 
advocate  
House minority leader Three Two must have expertise in nursing 
homes; one must be a representative 
of higher education  
Senate minority leader Three Two must have expertise in health care 
delivery; one must have expertise in 
the hospitality industry  
Chairperson of the 
Black and Puerto 
Rican Caucus 
One Representative of the Black and Puerto 
Rican Caucus  
 
The bill requires appointing authorities to make their appointments 
by September 1, 2021, and fill any vacancies. Commission members are 
not paid but must be reimbursed for necessary expenses within 
available funds.  
COMMISSION MEETINGS AND PROCEDURES  
The bill requires the House speaker and Senate president pro 
tempore to select the chairperson from among the commission’s 
members. The chairperson must schedule the commission’s first 
meeting, which must be held by September 1, 2021. After that, the 
commission must meet upon the call of the chairperson.  
Under the bill, a majority of the members constitutes a quorum to 
transact business.   2021HB-05614-R010621-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 4 	4/28/21 
 
COMMISSION REPORTS 
The bill requires the commission to annually report starting by 
January 1, 2022, to all commission appointing authorities and the 
governor on (1) the results of the commission’s analysis of the COVID-
19 pandemic’s disparate impact on the state’s racial, ethnic, gender, 
and socioeconomic groups and (2) policy and legislative 
recommendations to address the causes of any disparate impact and 
improve outcomes during any future pandemic.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Commerce Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 19 Nay 4 (03/11/2021)