Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05653 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 05/21/2021

                     
 
 
Substitute House Bill No. 5653 
 
Special Act No. 21-5 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING DE CLARATIONS OF PUBLIC HEALTH AND 
CIVIL PREPAREDNESS E MERGENCIES AND THE C REATION OF A 
BIPARTISAN COMMISSIO N TO STUDY STATUTES GOVERNING 
THE ISSUANCE OF SUCH DECLARATIONS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (Effective July 1, 2021) Notwithstanding the provisions of 
sections 19a-131a and 28-9 of the general statutes, the Governor is 
hereby authorized to renew: (1) The public health and civil 
preparedness emergencies declared in response to the COVID-19 
pandemic, and (2) any orders issued pursuant to the declarations and 
the renewal of such declarations that remain in effect as of July 20, 2021, 
provided any exercise of authority under this section is done in 
accordance with section 2 of this act. On and after July 1, 2021, the 
Governor may file the renewal of such declarations with the Secretary 
of the State in accordance with section 2 of this act and any such renewal 
may cover the period of time from July 21, 2021, through March 1, 2022. 
Not less than five days prior to filing the renewal of any emergency 
declaration with the Secretary of the State under section 2 of this act, the 
Governor shall provide electronic notice of such renewal to the 
president pro tempore of the Senate, the speaker of the House of 
Representatives, the majority leader of the Senate, the minority leader 
of the Senate, the majority leader of the House of Representatives, and  Substitute House Bill No. 5653 
 
Special Act No. 21-5 	2 of 4 
 
the minority leader of the House of Representatives. The provisions of 
this section shall not limit the Governor, or any department head, state 
agency or municipality from exercising any authority granted under 
said sections of the general statutes from July 21, 2021, through March 
1, 2022, provided any exercise of such authority in response to the 
COVID-19 pandemic is done in accordance with section 2 of this act. 
After March 1, 2022, nothing in this section or section 2 of this act shall 
affect or limit any authority conveyed pursuant to section 19a-131a or 
28-9 of the general statutes. As used in this section and section 2 of this 
act, "COVID-19" means the respiratory disease designated by the World 
Health Organization on February 11, 2020, as coronavirus 2019, and any 
related mutation thereof recognized by said organization as a 
communicable respiratory disease. 
Sec. 2. (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) The Governor may renew the public 
health and civil preparedness emergencies originally declared on March 
10, 2020, in response to the COVID-19 pandemic, provided: (1) Any such 
renewed declaration shall have a duration of not more than an 
additional sixty days from the date of the renewed declaration if such 
renewal is made during a regular session of the General Assembly or 
not more than an additional one hundred eighty days from the date of 
the renewed declaration if such renewal is made when the General 
Assembly is not in regular session, and (2) any such renewal issued by 
the Governor shall cease to be effective unless approved by a majority 
vote of each house of the General Assembly by resolution not later than 
three business days after the date of filing such renewal with the 
Secretary of the State. 
(b) Notwithstanding the provisions of sections 19a-131a and 28-9 of 
the general statutes, from July 21, 2021, through March 1, 2022, the 
Governor, or any department head, state agency or municipality may 
exercise any authority granted under sections 19a-131a and 28-9 of the 
general statutes in response to the COVID-19 pandemic, provided an  Substitute House Bill No. 5653 
 
Special Act No. 21-5 	3 of 4 
 
executive order issued under such authority shall not exceed the 
duration of the emergency declaration under which it has been issued 
and may be disapproved by a majority vote at a meeting of a joint 
legislative committee consisting of the president pro tempore of the 
Senate, the speaker of the House of Representatives, the majority leader 
of the Senate, the minority leader of the Senate, the majority leader of 
the House of Representatives and the minority leader of the House of 
Representatives. Such joint legislative committee meeting may be 
conducted on a virtual platform that can be viewed by the public. Any 
disapproval of an executive order by the joint legislative committee shall 
not be effective unless filed with the Secretary of the State not later than 
thirty-six hours after the Governor's filing of the order with the 
Secretary of the State. 
Sec. 3. (Effective from passage) (a) There is established a bipartisan 
commission to study sections 19a-131a and 28-9 of the general statutes 
and make recommendations on how said sections should be amended 
to provide greater legislative oversight of declarations of public health 
and civil preparedness emergencies and the exercise of executive 
authority pursuant to said sections. 
(b) The commission shall consist of the following members: 
(1) One appointed by the speaker of the House of Representatives; 
(2) One appointed by the president pro tempore of the Senate; 
(3) One appointed by the minority leader of the House of 
Representatives; 
(4) One appointed by the minority leader of the Senate; and 
(5) One appointed by the Governor. 
(c) Any member of the commission appointed under subdivision (1),  Substitute House Bill No. 5653 
 
Special Act No. 21-5 	4 of 4 
 
(2), (3), or (4) of subsection (b) of this section may be a member of the 
General Assembly. 
(d) All initial appointments to the commission shall be made not later 
than thirty days after the effective date of this section. Any vacancy shall 
be filled by the appointing authority. 
(e) The speaker of the House of Representatives and the president pro 
tempore of the Senate shall select the chairpersons of the commission 
from among the members of the task force. Such chairpersons shall 
schedule the first meeting of the commission, which shall be held not 
later than sixty days after the effective date of this section. 
(f) The administrative staff of the joint standing committee of the 
General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to government 
administration and elections shall serve as administrative staff of the 
commission. 
(g) Not later than January 1, 2022, the commission shall submit a 
report on its findings and recommendations to the joint standing 
committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters 
relating to government administration and elections, in accordance with 
the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes. The commission 
shall terminate on the date that it submits such report or January 1, 2022, 
whichever is later. 
Approved May 17, 2021