LCO No. 4923 1 of 3 General Assembly Committee Bill No. 5666 January Session, 2021 LCO No. 4923 Referred to Committee on HIGHER EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT ADVANCEMENT Introduced by: (HED) AN ACT CONCERNING GR ANTS TO DISTRESSED M UNICIPALITIES FOR THE TRAINING OF VOLUNTEER FIREFIGHTE RS. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) Not later than January 1, 1 2022, and annually thereafter, the chief of a volunteer fire department 2 for a distressed municipality, as defined in section 32-9p of the general 3 statutes, shall submit to the State Fire Administrator a report on the 4 yearly average of the number of volunteer firefighters from such 5 municipality's volunteer fire department who enrolled in Firefighter I 6 certification and recruit training based on the preceding four years, 7 except the year commencing January 1, 2020, shall not be included in 8 any such four preceding years for purposes of calculating such average. 9 (b) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, and each fiscal year 10 thereafter, the State Fire Administrator shall award a grant to any 11 distressed municipality with a volunteer fire department for the 12 purposes of covering costs related to the provision of Firefighter I 13 certification and recruit training for volunteer firefighters at regional fire 14 schools. The amount of such grant award for each such distressed 15 Committee Bill No. 5666 LCO No. 4923 2 of 3 municipality shall be equal to the product of (1) average cost of a 16 Firefighter I certification and recruit training program at a regional fire 17 school, and (2) the average number of volunteer firefighters from such 18 distressed municipality's volunteer fire department who enrolled at a 19 regional fire school for such certification and training. 20 (c) Not later than February 1, 2022, and annually thereafter, the State 21 Fire Administrator shall submit, in accordance with the provisions of 22 section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint standing committee of 23 the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to 24 appropriations and the budgets of state agencies a report on the (1) 25 reports submitted by the chiefs of volunteer fire departments of 26 distressed municipalities pursuant to subsection (a) of this section, and 27 (2) average cost of a Firefighter I certification and recruit training 28 program at a regional fire school. 29 Sec. 2. (Effective July 1, 2021) The sum of seventy thousand dollars is 30 appropriated to the State Fire Administrator, from the General Fund, for 31 the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, for grants to distressed 32 municipalities with a volunteer fire department pursuant to the 33 provisions of subsection (b) of section 1 of this act. 34 Sec. 3. (Effective July 1, 2021) The sum of seventy thousand dollars is 35 appropriated to the State Fire Administrator, from the General Fund, for 36 the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023, for grants to distressed 37 municipalities with a volunteer fire department pursuant to the 38 provisions of subsection (b) of section 1 of this act. 39 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Section 1 July 1, 2021 New section Sec. 2 July 1, 2021 New section Sec. 3 July 1, 2021 New section Committee Bill No. 5666 LCO No. 4923 3 of 3 Statement of Purpose: To require the State Fire Administrator to issue grants to distressed municipalities for the training of volunteer firefighters. [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.] Co-Sponsors: REP. ROCHELLE, 104th Dist.; REP. WINKLER, 56th Dist. REP. TURCO, 27th Dist. H.B. 5666