Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05666 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/06/2021

                     
 
LCO 4923  \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-05666-R02-
HB.docx  
1 of 2 
  
General Assembly  Committee Bill No.  5666  
January Session, 2021  
LCO No. 4923 
 
 
Referred to Committee on HIGHER EDUCATION AND 
EMPLOYMENT ADVANCEMENT 
 
 
Introduced by:  
(HED)  
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING GR ANTS TO DISTRESSED M UNICIPALITIES 
FOR THE TRAINING OF VOLUNTEER FIREFIGHTE RS.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) Not later than January 1, 1 
2022, and annually thereafter, the chief of a volunteer fire department 2 
for a distressed municipality, as defined in section 32-9p of the general 3 
statutes, shall submit to the State Fire Administrator a report on the 4 
yearly average of the number of volunteer firefighters from such 5 
municipality's volunteer fire department who enrolled in Firefighter I 6 
certification and recruit training based on the preceding four years, 7 
except the year commencing January 1, 2020, shall not be included in 8 
any such four preceding years for purposes of calculating such average. 9 
(b) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, and each fiscal year 10 
thereafter, the State Fire Administrator shall award a grant to any 11 
distressed municipality with a volunteer fire department for the 12 
purposes of covering costs related to the provision of Firefighter I 13 
certification and recruit training for volunteer firefighters at regional fire 14 
schools. The amount of such grant award for each such distressed 15  Committee Bill No. 5666 
 
 
LCO 4923  {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-05666-
R02-HB.docx }   
2 of 2 
 
municipality shall be equal to the product of (1) average cost of a 16 
Firefighter I certification and recruit training program at a regional fire 17 
school, and (2) the average number of volunteer firefighters from such 18 
distressed municipality's volunteer fire department who enrolled at a 19 
regional fire school for such certification and training.  20 
(c) Not later than February 1, 2022, and annually thereafter, the State 21 
Fire Administrator shall submit, in accordance with the provisions of 22 
section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint standing committee of 23 
the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to 24 
appropriations and the budgets of state agencies a report on the (1) 25 
reports submitted by the chiefs of volunteer fire departments of 26 
distressed municipalities pursuant to subsection (a) of this section, and 27 
(2) average cost of a Firefighter I certification and recruit training 28 
program at a regional fire school. 29 
Sec. 2. (Effective July 1, 2021) The sum of seventy thousand dollars is 30 
appropriated to the State Fire Administrator, from the General Fund, for 31 
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, for grants to distressed 32 
municipalities with a volunteer fire department pursuant to the 33 
provisions of subsection (b) of section 1 of this act. 34 
Sec. 3. (Effective July 1, 2021) The sum of seventy thousand dollars is 35 
appropriated to the State Fire Administrator, from the General Fund, for 36 
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023, for grants to distressed 37 
municipalities with a volunteer fire department pursuant to the 38 
provisions of subsection (b) of section 1 of this act. 39 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2021 New section 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2021 New section 
Sec. 3 July 1, 2021 New section 
 
HED Joint Favorable