Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05666 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/12/2021

                     
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-05666-R03-
HB.docx  
1 of 2 
  
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 5666  
January Session, 2021 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING GR ANTS TO DISTRESSED M UNICIPALITIES 
FOR THE TRAINING OF VOLUNTEER FIREFIGHTE RS.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) Not later than January 1, 1 
2022, and annually thereafter, the chief of a volunteer fire department 2 
for a distressed municipality, as defined in section 32-9p of the general 3 
statutes, shall submit to the State Fire Administrator a report on the 4 
yearly average of the number of volunteer firefighters from such 5 
municipality's volunteer fire department who enrolled in Firefighter I 6 
certification and recruit training based on the preceding four years, 7 
except the year commencing January 1, 2020, shall not be included in 8 
any such four preceding years for purposes of calculating such average. 9 
(b) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, and each fiscal year 10 
thereafter, the State Fire Administrator shall award a grant to any 11 
distressed municipality with a volunteer fire department for the 12 
purposes of covering costs related to the provision of Firefighter I 13 
certification and recruit training for volunteer firefighters at regional fire 14 
schools. The amount of such grant award for each such distressed 15 
municipality shall be equal to the product of (1) the average cost of a 16 
Firefighter I certification and recruit training program at a regional fire 17 
school, and (2) the average number of volunteer firefighters from such 18  Substitute Bill No. 5666 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-05666-
R03-HB.docx }   
2 of 2 
 
distressed municipality's volunteer fire department who enrolled at a 19 
regional fire school for such certification and training.  20 
(c) Not later than February 1, 2022, and annually thereafter, the State 21 
Fire Administrator shall submit, in accordance with the provisions of 22 
section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint standing committee of 23 
the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to 24 
appropriations and the budgets of state agencies a report on the (1) 25 
reports submitted by the chiefs of volunteer fire departments of 26 
distressed municipalities pursuant to subsection (a) of this section, and 27 
(2) average cost of a Firefighter I certification and recruit training 28 
program at a regional fire school. 29 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2021 New section 
 
APP Joint Favorable Subst.