Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05666 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/06/2021

                     
Researcher: MGS 	Page 1 	4/6/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 5666  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING GRANTS TO DISTRESSED 
MUNICIPALITIES FOR THE TRAINING OF VOLUNTEER 
FIREFIGHTERS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the state fire administrator to award a grant 
beginning in FY 22, and each year after, to any distressed municipality 
with a volunteer fire department to cover the cost of providing 
Firefighter I certification and recruit training at regional fire schools. 
The grant amount must equal the product of the (1) average number of 
enrolled volunteer firefighters in the distressed municipality and (2) 
average cost of the certification and training program at a regional fire 
school. (Presumably, the average cost is for the preceding four years, 
as discussed below.) The bill appropriates $70,000 per year from the 
General Fund, in FYs 22 and 23, to the state fire administrator for the 
grants.  
Additionally, the bill imposes two reporting requirements relating 
to the grant. First, it requires each distressed municipality’s volunteer 
fire department chief to report to the state fire administrator by 
January 1, 2022, and each year after, on the yearly average number of 
volunteer firefighters who enrolled in Firefighter I certification and 
recruit training based on the preceding four years, excluding 2020. 
Second, it requires the state fire administrator to report to the 
Appropriations Committee, by February 1, 2022, and each year after, 
on the annual reports of enrolled firefighters submitted by the chiefs 
and the average certification and training program cost at a regional 
fire school. 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  July 1, 2021 
COMMITTEE ACTION  2021HB-05666-R000257-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MGS 	Page 2 	4/6/21 
 
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 21 Nay 1 (03/18/2021)