Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05666 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/12/2021

                     
Researcher: MGS 	Page 1 	5/12/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 5666  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING GRANTS TO DISTRESSED 
MUNICIPALITIES FOR THE TRAINING OF VOLUNTEER 
FIREFIGHTERS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the state fire administrator to annually award a 
grant, beginning in FY 22, to any distressed municipality with a 
volunteer fire department to cover the cost of providing Firefighter I 
certification and recruit training at regional fire schools. The grant 
amount must equal the product of the (1) average number of enrolled 
volunteer firefighters in the distressed municipality and (2) average 
cost of the certification and training program at a regional fire school. 
(Presumably, the average cost is for the preceding four years, as 
described below.)  
Additionally, the bill imposes two reporting requirements relating 
to the grant. First, it requires each distressed municipality’s volunteer 
fire department chief to report to the state fire administrator by 
January 1, 2022, and each year after, on the yearly average number of 
volunteer firefighters who enrolled in Firefighter I certification and 
recruit training based on the preceding four years, excluding 2020. 
Second, it requires the state fire administrator to report to the 
Appropriations Committee, by February 1, 2022, and each year after, 
on the (1) chiefs’ annual reports of enrolled firefighters and (2) average 
certification and training program cost at a regional fire school. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2021 
BACKGROUND 
Legislative History 
The House referred the bill (File 257) to the Appropriations 
Committee, which reported a substitute that eliminates the provisions  2021HB-05666-R010680-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MGS 	Page 2 	5/12/21 
 
appropriating $70,000 per year from the General Fund, in FYs 22 and 
23, to the state fire administrator for the grants. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 21 Nay 1 (03/18/2021) 
 
Appropriations Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 47 Nay 1 (05/03/2021)