Researcher: MGS Page 1 5/12/21 OLR Bill Analysis sHB 5666 AN ACT CONCERNING GRANTS TO DISTRESSED MUNICIPALITIES FOR THE TRAINING OF VOLUNTEER FIREFIGHTERS. SUMMARY This bill requires the state fire administrator to annually award a grant, beginning in FY 22, to any distressed municipality with a volunteer fire department to cover the cost of providing Firefighter I certification and recruit training at regional fire schools. The grant amount must equal the product of the (1) average number of enrolled volunteer firefighters in the distressed municipality and (2) average cost of the certification and training program at a regional fire school. (Presumably, the average cost is for the preceding four years, as described below.) Additionally, the bill imposes two reporting requirements relating to the grant. First, it requires each distressed municipality’s volunteer fire department chief to report to the state fire administrator by January 1, 2022, and each year after, on the yearly average number of volunteer firefighters who enrolled in Firefighter I certification and recruit training based on the preceding four years, excluding 2020. Second, it requires the state fire administrator to report to the Appropriations Committee, by February 1, 2022, and each year after, on the (1) chiefs’ annual reports of enrolled firefighters and (2) average certification and training program cost at a regional fire school. EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2021 BACKGROUND Legislative History The House referred the bill (File 257) to the Appropriations Committee, which reported a substitute that eliminates the provisions 2021HB-05666-R010680-BA.DOCX Researcher: MGS Page 2 5/12/21 appropriating $70,000 per year from the General Fund, in FYs 22 and 23, to the state fire administrator for the grants. COMMITTEE ACTION Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee Joint Favorable Yea 21 Nay 1 (03/18/2021) Appropriations Committee Joint Favorable Substitute Yea 47 Nay 1 (05/03/2021)