Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05668 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/03/2021

                     
 
 
 
LCO No. 4394   	1 of 5 
 
General Assembly  Committee Bill No. 5668  
January Session, 2021  
LCO No. 4394 
 
 
Referred to Committee on HIGHER EDUCATION AND 
EMPLOYMENT ADVANCEMENT  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(HED)  
 
 
 
AN ACT REQUIRING THE OFFICE OF HIGHER EDUCATION TO 
ESTABLISH A MICROCREDENTIAL PILO T PROGRAM. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) As used in this section:  1 
(1) "Microcredential" means a digital badge earned in six months or 2 
less through completion of for-credit or noncredit coursework and 3 
demonstrated mastery of a specific skill;  4 
(2) "Digital badge" means an indicator of accomplishment or skill that 5 
can be displayed, accessed and verified online; and 6 
(3) "Microcredential provider" means an institution of higher 7 
education, an employer in the state, a professional association or other 8 
entity that develops and offers a microcredential. 9 
(b) Not later than January 1, 2022, the Office of Higher Education, in 10 
consultation with the Board of Regents for Higher Education, shall 11 
establish a pilot program to develop a virtual platform on which 12 
microcredentials may be earned or renewed by state residents and 13    
Committee Bill No.  5668 
 
 
LCO No. 4394   	2 of 5 
 
offered by microcredential providers. The office may enter into a 14 
contract with a third-party administrator to develop and administer the 15 
virtual platform. Any such third-party administrator shall be required 16 
under such contract to charge such third-party administrator's lowest 17 
available rate for such services. Such virtual platform shall include, but 18 
not be limited to, (1) a catalog of the available microcredentials with 19 
information submitted by the microcredential provider pursuant to 20 
subsection (c) of this section, (2) an access portal for a microcredential 21 
provider to develop and offer microcredentials, (3) an access portal for 22 
state residents to (A) earn or renew microcredentials, (B) share the 23 
receipt of microcredentials with employers or institutions of higher 24 
education, and (C) submit applications for jobs opportunities posted on 25 
the virtual platform, (4) an access portal for employers in the state to 26 
post job opportunities that require skills which may be demonstrated 27 
through one or more microcredentials, (5) online support for all users of 28 
the virtual platform, and (6) a means for employers and institutions of 29 
higher education to prepurchase microcredentials for distribution to 30 
employees or students. 31 
(c) Each user of the virtual platform shall register in the form and 32 
manner prescribed by the Office of Higher Education. Each 33 
microcredential provider shall submit information for each new 34 
microcredential offered by such provider, including, but not limited to, 35 
(1) the name of the microcredential, (2) whether the microcredential is 36 
industry-recognized, (3) whether a microcredential is offered through 37 
synchronous or asynchronous coursework, (4) the enrollment fee, if any, 38 
provided such fee shall not exceed an amount established by the office, 39 
(5) the expected time for completion, (6) any required prerequisites, 40 
provided related work experience shall be allowed in lieu of course 41 
prerequisites whenever possible, (7) the effective period of a 42 
microcredential if such microcredential is for a limited duration, (8) the 43 
rubric by which a microcredential provider evaluates whether an 44 
enrolled student successfully demonstrated mastery of the skill related 45 
to the microcredential, and (9) if the microcredential provider is an 46 
institution of higher education, the number college credits earned upon 47    
Committee Bill No.  5668 
 
 
LCO No. 4394   	3 of 5 
 
completion and the career pathway for such microcredential, including, 48 
but not limited to, certificate or degree programs to which any 49 
completed credits may be applied.  50 
(d) The Office of Higher Education may deny access to the virtual 51 
platform to any microcredential provider that offers one or more 52 
microcredentials that do not meet the academic or industry standards 53 
of employers and institutions of higher education in the state. The office 54 
shall establish a process by which such microcredential provider may 55 
appeal the office's denial of access.  56 
(e) The Office of Higher Education shall consult with the Department 57 
of Economic and Community Development and the Labor Department 58 
to identify shortages in the state labor market and solicit the 59 
participation of microcredential providers to offer microcredentials on 60 
the virtual platform to meet such shortages. 61 
(f) Not later than six months after a person has completed a 62 
microcredential, the Office of Higher Education shall distribute a survey 63 
to such person which shall include, but not be limited to, questions 64 
regarding such person's (1) goals for completing the microcredential, (2) 65 
employment status, (3) experience with the coursework and the virtual 66 
platform, and (4) intention to use the virtual platform in the future to 67 
earn other microcredentials or to seek employment. 68 
(g) Each employer posting job opportunities on the virtual platform 69 
shall submit a fee in an amount established by the Office of Higher 70 
Education for each such posting. Any enrollment fee or job posting fee 71 
shall be deposited into the microcredential account established 72 
pursuant to subsection (h) of this section. The fees paid to the 73 
microcredential account shall be expended by the office to compensate 74 
microcredential providers and for reasonable and necessary expenses 75 
for the administration of the virtual platform. 76 
(h) There is established an account to be known as the 77 
"microcredential account" which shall be a separate, nonlapsing account 78    
Committee Bill No.  5668 
 
 
LCO No. 4394   	4 of 5 
 
within the General Fund. The account shall contain any moneys 79 
required by law to be deposited in the account. Moneys in the account 80 
shall be expended by the Office of Higher Education as set forth in 81 
subsection (g) of this section. 82 
(i) Not later than January 1, 2023, and annually thereafter, until 83 
January 1, 2026, the Office of Higher Education shall submit a report, in 84 
accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, 85 
to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having 86 
cognizance of matters relating to higher education. Such report shall 87 
include (1) the catalog of microcredentials available on the virtual 88 
platform, highlighting any new microcredentials offered and any 89 
microcredentials ceased during the prior year, (2) the number of users 90 
who registered on the virtual platform by type of user, (3) the number 91 
of students who enrolled and the number of students who completed 92 
each microcredential, (4) the results of the student survey conducted 93 
pursuant to subsection (f) of this section, and (5) in the final report, the 94 
office's decision on whether to establish the pilot program permanently 95 
or whether to terminate the pilot program. 96 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2021 New section 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To require the Office of Higher Education to establish a pilot program 
to develop a virtual platform on which state residents can earn 
microcredentials. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.] 
 
Co-Sponsors:  REP. MCCARTHY VAHEY, 133rd Dist.  
 
H.B. 5668       
    
Committee Bill No.  5668 
 
 
LCO No. 4394   	5 of 5