Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05668 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/08/2021

                     
Researcher: JC 	Page 1 	4/8/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 5668  
 
AN ACT REQUIRING THE OFFICE OF HIGHER EDUCATION TO 
ESTABLISH A MICROCREDENTIAL PILOT PROGRAM.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Office of Higher Education (OHE), in 
consultation with the Board of Regents for Higher Education, to 
establish a pilot program by January 1, 2022, to develop a virtual 
platform for state residents to earn or renew a microcredential offered 
by a microcredential provider.  
The bill defines a microcredential as a digital badge (i.e., an 
indicator of accomplishment or skill that can be displayed, accessed, 
and verified online) earned in no more than six months by completing 
for-credit or noncredit coursework and demonstrating mastery of a 
specific skill. A “microcredential provider” is a higher education 
institution, employer in the state, professional association, or other 
entity that develops and offers a microcredential. 
The bill requires OHE to consult with the departments of Economic 
and Community Development and Labor to identify shortages in the 
state labor market and solicit the participation of microcredential 
providers to offer microcredentials on the virtual platform that address 
the shortages. 
The bill also requires OHE to develop and distribute a survey to 
people who complete a microcredential to obtain their completion 
goals, employment status, and their experience with the 
microcredential coursework and virtual platform. 
The bill creates a “microcredential account” as a separate, non-
lapsing General Fund account to contain enrollment fees and fees from 
employers who post job opportunities on the platform.  2021HB-05668-R000335-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 2 	4/8/21 
 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  July 1, 2021 
VIRTUAL PLATFORM 
The bill allows OHE to contract with a third-party administrator to 
develop and administer the virtual platform. The administrator must 
provide this service at its lowest available rate. Under the bill, the 
virtual platform must include: (1) a catalog of available 
microcredentials with provider provided information, (2) online 
support for all virtual platform users, and (3) a means for employers 
and higher education institutions to pre-purchase microcredentials for 
employee and student distribution. 
The platform must also include an access portal for: 
1. a microcredential provider to develop and offer 
microcredentials; 
2. state residents to (a) earn or renew microcredentials, (b) share 
the receipt of microcredentials with employers or higher 
education institutions, and (c) submit applications for job 
opportunities posted on the virtual platform; and 
3. employers in the state to post job opportunities that require 
skills that can be demonstrated through one or more 
microcredentials. 
The bill requires each virtual platform user to register in OHE’s 
prescribed form and manner. 
MICROCREDENTIAL PROV IDER REGISTRATION  
Under the bill, each microcredential provider must submit 
information for each new microcredential it offers, including: 
1. the microcredential name; 
2. whether the microcredential is industry-recognized; 
3. whether a microcredential is offered through synchronous or 
asynchronous coursework;  2021HB-05668-R000335-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 3 	4/8/21 
 
4. the enrollment fee, if any, provided the fee must not exceed an 
OHE-established amount; 
5. the expected time for completion; 
6. any required perquisites, provided related work experience 
must be allowed in lieu of course prerequisites whenever 
possible; 
7. the effective period of a microcredential if the microcredential is 
for limited duration; 
8. the rubric a microcredential provider uses to determine 
successful demonstrated mastery of the skill related to the 
microcredential; and  
9. if the microcredential provider is a higher education institution, 
the number of college credits earned upon completion and the 
microcredential career pathway, including certificate or degree 
programs where the completed credits may be applied. 
Under the bill, OHE may deny access to the virtual platform to any 
microcredential provider that offers one or more microcredentials that 
do not meet academic or industry standards of employers and higher 
education institutions. OHE must establish a process for providers to 
appeal access denial. 
SURVEY 
Under the bill, OHE must distribute a survey to a person who has 
completed a microcredential within six months of completion. The 
survey must include questions about the person’s (1) goals for 
completing the microcredential, (2) employment status, (3) experience 
with the coursework and the virtual platform, and (4) intention to use 
the virtual platform in the future to earn other microcredentials or to 
seek employment. 
 MICROCREDENTIAL ACCO UNT 
The bill creates a “microcredential account,” as a separate, non- 2021HB-05668-R000335-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 4 	4/8/21 
 
lapsing General Fund account. The account must contain any money 
required by law to be deposited into it.  
Under the bill, employers posting job opportunities on the virtual 
platform are required to submit a fee in the amount OHE establishes, 
and any fee must be deposited into the account. OHE must spend fees 
paid into the account (1) to compensate microcredential providers and 
(2) for reasonable and necessary virtual platform administration 
expenses. 
REPORTING REQUIREMEN TS 
The bill requires OHE, by January 1, 2023, and annually thereafter, 
to submit to the Higher Education and Employment Advancement 
Committee a report that includes: 
1. the catalog of microcredentials available on the virtual platform, 
highlighting any new microcredentials offered and ceased 
during the prior year; 
2. the number of registered users on the virtual platform by user 
type; 
3. the number of enrolled students and students who complete 
each microcredential; 
4. the student survey results; and 
5. in the final report, OHE’s decision on whether to permanently 
establish or terminate the pilot program. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 22 Nay 0 (03/22/2021)